Vlasak v. AFNI Inc
Plaintiff: Jennifer Vlasak
Defendant: AFNI Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01209
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 10/22/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AFNI Inc - Waiver sent on 9/12/2019. (Eldridge, Mark)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jennifer Vlasak. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Eldridge, Mark)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Certify Class (Damasco, Campbell-Ewald), Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Relief from memorandum, supporting documents, and automatic briefing requirements, Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Stay the motion for class certification until the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference by Jennifer Vlasak. (Eldridge, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Jennifer Vlasak. (Eldridge, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (class action) with Jury Demand; against AFNI Inc by Jennifer Vlasak. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3194809) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: billing statement, #2 Exhibit B: billing statement, #3 Exhibit C: billing statement, #4 Exhibit D: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Eldridge, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vlasak v. AFNI Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Vlasak
Represented By: Mark A Eldridge
Represented By: Ben J Slatky
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Jesse Fruchter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFNI Inc
Represented By: Justin M Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?