Vales v. Manthei et al
Plaintiff: Willie L Vales, Jr
Defendant: CO Barzyk, Sgt Manthei, Nicklaus, Keith Barzyk, Christopher Manthei and Samantha Rynes
Case Number: 2:2019cv01219
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 10/11/2019: Amended Pleadings due by 11/15/2019; Motions to Dismiss due by 12/13/2019; Discovery to be completed by 4/1/2020; Interim Settlement Report due by 4/24/2020; Summary Judgment Motions due by 5/1/2020. Dates for trial, other relevant pretrial deadlines, and final settlement report to be set as necessary. See Order. (Attachments: #1 Rules and Guides) (cc: all counsel, via mail to Willie L Vales, Jr at Waupun Correctional Institution)(jm)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Renee Remington on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Jennifer Remington (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Remington, Jennifer)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to All Defendants (Flugaur, Brandon)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon T Flugaur on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Brandon Flugaur (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Flugaur, Brandon)
September 13, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANTS requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCREENING ORDER re #1 Plaintiff's Complaint signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 9/12/2019. #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee is GRANTED; agency having custody of Plaintiff to COLLECT the balance of the filing fee in accordance with this Order. Plaintiff is PERMITTED to proceed on the following claims: use of excessive force, in violation of the Eighth Amendment, by Defendant CO Barzyk; and failure to intervene, in violation of the Eighth Amendment, by all Defendants. Copies of Plaintiff's Complaint and this Order to be electronically SENT to the Wisconsin DOJ for service on Defendants, who shall FILE a responsive pleading within 60 days. See Order. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Willie L Vales, Jr and Warden at Waupun Correctional Institution) (jm)
September 9, 2019 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $6.22, receipt number MK4689-079419. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
September 4, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (Mailed NEF to plaintiff via USPS) (asc)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Willie L Vales, Jr. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (cms)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from the Clerk to Willie L Vales, Jr regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph that on or before September 13, 2019 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $6.22 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Plaintiff & Warden at Waupun Correctional)(blr)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Mailed to plaintiff. (cms)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Willie L Vales, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Authorization)(cms)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Willie L Vales, Jr. (cms)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with jury demand filed against All Defendants by Willie L Vales, Jr. (cms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vales v. Manthei et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Barzyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Manthei
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicklaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Barzyk
Represented By: Jennifer Renee Remington
Represented By: Brandon T Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Manthei
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Represented By: Jennifer Renee Remington
Represented By: Brandon T Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Rynes
Represented By: Jennifer Renee Remington
Represented By: Brandon T Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie L Vales, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?