Routine Baseball LLC et al v. Zimmerman et al
Plaintiff: Routine Baseball LLC and Complex Solutions LLC
Defendant: Kokomo Baseball LLC, Rock League Baseball LLC, SC Waukesha Inc, Michael Zimmerman, Milwaukee Wave LLC, Milwaukee Milkmen Baseball LLC, Lifestyle Sports Apparel LLC and Ballpark Commons LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: ROC Ventures LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Michael DeGrave
Case Number: 2:2019cv01227
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/11/2019 re #10 Stipulation for Referral to Mediation and Extension of Time to Respond to Countercomplaint and Third-Party Complaint. The court has referred the case for mediation under separate order. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for plaintiff-counter defendants Routine Baseball and Complex Solutions and third-party defendant Michael DeGrave to respond to the countercomplaint and third-party complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on December 9, 2019. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/11/2019 REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Patricia J. Gorence for Mediation. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Referral to Mediation and Extension of Time to Respond to Countercomplaint and Third-Party Complaint by Complex Solutions LLC, Michael DeGrave, Routine Baseball LLC. (Weseman, Draeke)
September 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to Michael DeGrave. (ds)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Condon, Jacques)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT filed by ROC Ventures LLC against Michael DeGrave, and Counterclaim against Routine Baseball, LLC and Complex Solutions, LLC against (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- promissory note, #2 Exhibit B -- email and summary, #3 Exhibit C -- maddon post, #4 Exhibit D -- press release, #5 Exhibit E -- social media post, #6 Exhibit F -- email signage, #7 Exhibit G -- email logo, #8 Exhibit H -- email July, #9 Exhibit I -- notice letter, #10 Exhibit J -- invoices, #11 Exhibit K -- Sept 9 email, #12 Exhibit L -- Sept 10 email, #13 Summons Summons -- DeGrave)(Condon, Jacques)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Condon, Jacques)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacques C Condon on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Jacques C. Condon (Condon, Jacques)
September 13, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Krummen, Craig)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants served on 8/29/2019. (Krummen, Craig) Modified on 9/5/2019 (asc).
August 23, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified. Party names should not include punctuation. Please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. Please refer to the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance. (blr)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (blr)
August 23, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (blr)
August 23, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Krummen, Craig)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Complex Solutions, LLC, Routine Baseball, LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3198332) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Registration Certificates, #2 Exhibit B - Non-Binding Letter of Intent, #3 Exhibit C - screenshot of communications, #4 Exhibit D - Zimmerman email, #5 Exhibit E - Invoice CS100763, #6 Exhibit F - FedEx email, #7 Exhibit G - Invoices, #8 Exhibit H - August 23 social media screenshots, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons - M. Zimmerman, #11 Summons - ROC Ventures, #12 Summons - Ballpark Commons, #13 Summons - Lifestyle Sports Apparel, #14 Summons - Milwaukee Milkmen Baseball, #15 Summons - Milwaukee Wave, #16 Summons - Kokomo Baseball, #17 Summons - SC Waukesha, #18 Summons - Rock Leauge Baseball)(Krummen, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Routine Baseball LLC et al v. Zimmerman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Routine Baseball LLC
Represented By: Draeke H Weseman
Represented By: Brian C Miller
Represented By: Craig S Krummen
Represented By: Brian Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Complex Solutions LLC
Represented By: Draeke H Weseman
Represented By: Brian C Miller
Represented By: Craig S Krummen
Represented By: Brian Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kokomo Baseball LLC
Represented By: Jacques C Condon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock League Baseball LLC
Represented By: Jacques C Condon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC Waukesha Inc
Represented By: Jacques C Condon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Zimmerman
Represented By: Jacques C Condon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Wave LLC
Represented By: Jacques C Condon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Milkmen Baseball LLC
Represented By: Jacques C Condon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifestyle Sports Apparel LLC
Represented By: Jacques C Condon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ballpark Commons LLC
Represented By: Jacques C Condon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: ROC Ventures LLC
Represented By: Jacques C Condon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Michael DeGrave
Represented By: Draeke H Weseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?