Cheri et al v. Milwaukee Entertainment LLC
Plaintiff: Hilary Hepner, Brenda Geiger, Katarina Van Derham, Ana Cheri, Lucy Pinder, Jessica Hinton and Tiffany Toth Gray
Defendant: Milwaukee Entertainment LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01229
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 10/22/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Milwaukee Entertainment LLC.(Nichols, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T Nichols on behalf of Milwaukee Entertainment LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeffrey T. Nichols (Nichols, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants served 9/16/2019. (Aronowitz, Edmund) Modified on 10/1/2019 (blr).
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Aronowitz, Edmund)
August 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to Milwaukee Entertainment LLC. (asc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Aronowitz, Edmund)
August 23, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Lucy Pinder, Tiffany Toth Gray, Katarina Van Derham, Brenda Geiger, Ana Cheri, Hilary Hepner, Jessica Hinton. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3198506) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Aronowitz, Edmund)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheri et al v. Milwaukee Entertainment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Entertainment LLC
Represented By: Daniel K Mullin
Represented By: Jeffrey T Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilary Hepner
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Paul K Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Geiger
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Paul K Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katarina Van Derham
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Paul K Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Cheri
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Paul K Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Paul K Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hinton
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Paul K Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Toth Gray
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Paul K Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?