International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 139, AFL-CIO et al v. Daley
Plaintiff: Heath Hanrahan, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 139, AFL-CIO and Karen Erickson
Defendant: James J. Daley
Case Number: 2:2019cv01233
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #18 MOTION to Intervene Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Motion to Intervene filed by Kristi Koschkee). (Ryan, Patrick)
October 24, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #13 MOTION to Intervene (Response In Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ryan, Patrick)
October 18, 2019 Filing 25 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #18 MOTION to Intervene , #13 MOTION to Intervene . (Kilpatrick, Steven)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 10/16/19. Interim Settlement Report due by 3/27/20; Dispositive Motions due by 4/1/20; Final Settlement Report due by 7/10/20; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 7/17/20; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 7/22/20. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 8/3/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(cl)
October 16, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 10/16/2019. (Court Reporter Thomas Malkiewicz)(cl)
October 10, 2019 Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Plaintiffs. (Ryan, Patrick)
October 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Misha Tseytlin on behalf of Wisconsin Legislature. Attorney(s) appearing: Misha Tseytlin (Tseytlin, Misha)
October 1, 2019 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE Statement by Wisconsin Legislature. (Lawless, Lisa)
September 30, 2019 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE Statement by Kristi Koschkee. (Esenberg, Richard)
September 30, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Intervene by Kristi Koschkee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Mem of Law in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit B - Koschkee Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Answer, #4 Exhibit D - Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit E - Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Esenberg, Richard) Modified on 10/1/2019 (blr).
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony LoCoco Richard M Esenberg on behalf of Kristi Koschkee. Attorney(s) appearing: Anthony F. LoCoco (Esenberg, Richard) Modified on 10/1/2019 (blr).
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas Vebber Richard M Esenberg on behalf of Kristi Koschkee. Attorney(s) appearing: Lucas Vebber (Esenberg, Richard) Modified on 10/1/2019 (blr).
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M Esenberg on behalf of Kristi Koschkee. Attorney(s) appearing: Richard M. Esenberg (Esenberg, Richard)
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF in Support filed by Wisconsin Legislature re #13 MOTION to Intervene . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 3/27/2019 Order, #2 Exhibit B 4/30/2019 Order, #3 Exhibit C Docket from 18cv285, #4 Exhibit D Stipulation for Dismissal from Allen case in US Supreme Court, #5 Exhibit Proposed Intervener Wisconsin Legislature's Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit Proposed Intervener Wisconsin Legislature's Supporting Brief for Motion to Dismiss)(Lawless, Lisa)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Intervene by Wisconsin Legislature. (Lawless, Lisa)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M Lawless on behalf of Wisconsin Legislature. Attorney(s) appearing: Lisa M. Lawless (Lawless, Lisa)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M McLeod on behalf of Wisconsin Legislature. Attorney(s) appearing: Eric M. McLeod (McLeod, Eric)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF in Support filed by James J Daley re #9 MOTION to Dismiss . (Kilpatrick, Steven)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by James J Daley. (Kilpatrick, Steven)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 10/10/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
September 24, 2019 Due to the unavailability of Magistrate Judge David E. Jones, this case has been reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. (kah)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C Kilpatrick on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Steven C. Kilpatrick, Clayton P. Kawski (Kilpatrick, Steven)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. James J Daley served on 9/6/2019. (Hlavin, Brian)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 08/27/2019. Plaintiff must file proof of service of the complaint or a report on the status of service for each defendant within 45 days of the date of this order. There is no document attached to this order. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
August 27, 2019 Summons Issued as to James J Daley. (amb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Hlavin, Brian)
August 26, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick N Ryan on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Patrick N. Ryan (Ryan, Patrick)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C Hlavin on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Brian C. Hlavin (Hlavin, Brian)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James J. Daley by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 139, AFL-CIO, Heath Hanrahan, Karen Erickson. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3199799) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hlavin, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 139, AFL-CIO et al v. Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heath Hanrahan
Represented By: Patrick N Ryan
Represented By: Brian C Hlavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 139, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Patrick N Ryan
Represented By: Brian C Hlavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Erickson
Represented By: Patrick N Ryan
Represented By: Brian C Hlavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?