Martellotta v. Saul
Plaintiff: Paul Martellotta
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv01257
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/20/2019. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin for all further proceedings. Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Paul Martellotta. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Marcus, Meredith)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Marie Godfrey on behalf of Andrew M Saul. Attorney(s) appearing: Jean Godfrey (Godfrey, Jean)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 9/10/2019. (blr)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/10/2019. (blr)
September 13, 2019 NOTICE: Due to the unavailability of Magistrate Judge David E. Jones, the magistrate judge now assigned to this case is William E. Duffin. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin to be filed within 21 days. The consent/refusal form is available a t the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov. (asc)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Paul Martellotta. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Marcus, Meredith)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties. By 11/4/2019 defendant to file and serve certified administrative record. Plaintiff's brief due 12/16/2019; defendant's response due 1/27/2020; plaintiff's reply due 2/11/2020. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
September 4, 2019 Transmit #1 Complaint and #6 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/3/2019 GRANTING #2 plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Paul Martellotta. (Daley, Frederick)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith E Marcus on behalf of Paul Martellotta. Attorney(s) appearing: Meredith E. Marcus (Marcus, Meredith)
August 29, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick J Daley, Jr on behalf of Paul Martellotta. Attorney(s) appearing: Frederick J. Daley, Jr. (Daley, Frederick)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Paul Martellotta. (Daley, Frederick)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Paul Martellotta (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daley, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martellotta v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Martellotta
Represented By: Meredith E Marcus
Represented By: Frederick J Daley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Jean Marie Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?