Marty v. MOHELA et al
Appellee: United States of America, Department of Education, MOHELA, University of Northern Iowa, United States of America Department of Education and UNI Perkins Loans
Appellant: Michael Spiritfair Marty
Trustee: Virginia George
Case Number: 2:2019cv01263
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Spiritfair Marty. (amb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF ADDENDUM filed by Michael Spiritfair Marty. (amb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF APPENDIX of Exhibits filed by Michael Spiritfair Marty. (amb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF APPENDIX filed by Michael Spiritfair Marty. (amb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF filed by Michael Spiritfair Marty. (amb)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 Supplemental Transmittal of Record on Appeal: TRANSCRIPTS re #6 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Adversary Docket Sheet, #2 Transcript from Hearing Held 8-14-19) (kan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEFING LETTER mailed to appellant and electronically transmitted to appellee. (amb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 RECORD ON APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-2187. (Attachments: #1 Adversary Docket Sheet, #2 Adversary Documents 1, 12, 21, 23, 28, 33, 38-40, 43-44, 50,52-53, 55, and 59, #3 Adversary Documents 51, 66, and 70)(kan)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 DISREGARD. DOCKETED IN ERROR. BRIEFING LETTER mailed to appellant and electronically transmitted to appellee. (amb) Modified on 9/17/2019 (amb).
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Designation of Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal by Michael Spiritfair Marty. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (amb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of Issues to be Presented in the Appeal by Michael Spiritfair Marty. (amb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Ordinary Transcript Request by Michael Spiritfair Marty. (amb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2019: #1 Certificate of Service) (amb).
August 30, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper (jcl)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL (Short Record) from Bankruptcy Court case number 18-2187; (Attachments: #1 Adversary Docket Sheet with Order for Judgment) Appeal Filing Fee Paid(kan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marty v. MOHELA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: United States of America, Department of Education
Represented By: Carter Bryan Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MOHELA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: University of Northern Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: United States of America Department of Education
Represented By: Carter Bryan Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UNI Perkins Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Michael Spiritfair Marty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Virginia George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?