Posada v. Arts Performing Center LLC
Plaintiff: Lina Posada
Defendant: Arts Performing Center, LLC, Silk Exotic on Water and Arts Performing Center LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01267
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/22/2019. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 11/12/2019. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by Arts Performing Center LLC. (Cade, Nathaniel)
October 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Arts Performing Center LLC.(Cade, Nathaniel)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Cade, Jr on behalf of Arts Performing Center LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Nathaniel Cade, Jr. (Cade, Nathaniel)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lina Posada. Arts Performing Center LLC served on 9/29/2019. (Aronowitz, Edmund)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Aronowitz, Edmund)
September 3, 2019 Summons Issued as to Arts Performing Center LLC. (amb)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Aronowitz, Edmund)
August 30, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Arts Performing Center, LLC by Lina Posada. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3204307) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Aronowitz, Edmund)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Posada v. Arts Performing Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arts Performing Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silk Exotic on Water
Represented By: Nathaniel Cade, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arts Performing Center LLC
Represented By: Nathaniel Cade, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lina Posada
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Paul K Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?