Hormann v. Saul
Plaintiff: Allison Hormann
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv01271
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/19/2019. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 9/10/2019. (blr)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/10/2019. (blr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Allison Hormann. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Dreis, David)
September 13, 2019 NOTICE: Due to the unavailability of Magistrate Judge David E. Jones, the magistrate judge now assigned to this case is Nancy Joseph. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph to be filed within 21 days. The consent/refusal form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties. By 11/4/2019 defendant to file and serve certified administrative record. Plaintiff's brief due 12/16/2019; defendant's response due 1/27/2020; plaintiff's reply due 2/11/2020. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
September 4, 2019 Transmit #1 Complaint and #5 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/3/2019 GRANTING #3 plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
September 2, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Allison Hormann. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Dreis, David)
August 30, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Allison Hormann. (Dreis, David)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Allison Hormann. (Dreis, David)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Allison Hormann (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dreis, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hormann v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Hormann
Represented By: David G Dreis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?