Farnam et al v. Airport Lounge Inc
Plaintiff: Alyssa Nobriga and Nicole Farnam
Defendant: Airport Lounge, Inc. and Airport Lounge Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01284
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 10/31/2019. Interim Settlement Report due by 3/20/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 3/27/2020; Final Settlement Report due by 7/7/2020; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 7/10/2020; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 7/15/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/21/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 7/27/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(nb)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 10/31/2019. (Court Reporter Tom Malkiewicz) (nb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan B Jacobson on behalf of Airport Lounge Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Ryan B. Jacobson (Jacobson, Ryan)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Plaintiffs. (Aronowitz, Edmund)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Danessa P Watkins on behalf of Airport Lounge Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Danessa P. Watkins (Watkins, Danessa)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 10/10/2019 GRANTING #7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. By 11/6/2019, Defendant Airport Lounge Inc shall answer or otherwise respond to #1 Plaintiffs' Complaint. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 10/28/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 Expedited MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Airport Lounge Inc. (Trevino, Joseph)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Airport Lounge Inc. (Trevino, Joseph)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P Trevino on behalf of Airport Lounge Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Joseph P. Trevino (Trevino, Joseph)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants served 9/18/2019. (Aronowitz, Edmund) Modified on 10/1/2019 (blr).
September 13, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Aronowitz, Edmund)
September 5, 2019 Summons Issued as to Airport Lounge Inc. (blr)
September 4, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Aronowitz, Edmund)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Airport Lounge, Inc. by Nicole Farnam, Alyssa Nobriga. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3207000) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Aronowitz, Edmund)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farnam et al v. Airport Lounge Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Nobriga
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Paul K Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Farnam
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Paul K Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airport Lounge, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airport Lounge Inc
Represented By: Danessa P Watkins
Represented By: Ryan B Jacobson
Represented By: Joseph P Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?