Scales v. Noonan et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Avery Scales
Defendant: CO Kregt, Deputy Burtardt, Sara Jeggler, CO Thompson, Nurse Amanda, CO Sylas, CO Gibbs, Patrick Noonan, City of Racine, CO Knegt and CO Saulys
Case Number: 2:2019cv01360
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER from plaintiff re: dollar demand (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vkb)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER from plaintiff re: correcting spelling of one defendant's name, requesting that defendants be added to his case and requesting a copy of the docket (Attachments: #1 Letter from clerk in response)(vkb)
October 4, 2019 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $7.00, receipt number MK4689-079767 ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department. (ds)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST to add defendants by Phillip Avery Scales. (amb)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST to add defendants by Phillip Avery Scales. (amb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Waive the Initial Partial Filing Fee filed by plaintiff Phillip Avery Scales (vkb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 DOCUMENTS RECEIVED from Plaintiff - Copy of letter from attorney declining to represent him (vkb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff sending Local Rules and FAQ's (vkb)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Phillip Avery Scales. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vkb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER from plaintiff correcting spelling of defendant Saulys name (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vkb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by plaintiff Phillip Avery Scales (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Envelope)(vkb)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/23/2019. On or before 10/14/2019 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $6.75 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Phillip Scales at Racine County Jail; Racine County Sheriff)(cb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by plaintiff (vkb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (ds)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTIONS for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Phillip Avery Scales. (ds)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Phillip Avery Scales. (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scales v. Noonan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Kregt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Burtardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Jeggler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Amanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Sylas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Racine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Knegt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Saulys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Avery Scales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?