Campbell v. Campbell et al
Plaintiff: Gerald T Campbell
Defendant: Randall George Campbell, Brigette Patton, Miriam A Cavanaugh and David Reader
Case Number: 2:2019cv01369
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gerald T Campbell. Gerald T Campbell served on 11/5/2019; Brigette Patton served on 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(amb)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER from plaintiff re: package delivery to Miriam Ann Cavanaugh. (amb)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Miriam A Cavanaugh - Waiver sent on 10/21/2019. (Fleury, Thomas)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Fleury on behalf of Miriam A Cavanaugh. Attorney(s) appearing: Thomas L. Fleury (Fleury, Thomas)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Reader Notice of Appearance (Seward, T)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Reader (Re: Defendant David J. Readers Waiver of the Service of Summons) (Seward, T)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER re attempts to service defendants via notice and waiver from plaintiff. (Reissued and mailed to plaintiff via USPS summons and service packet as to defendants Randall George Campbell, Brigette Patton, and Miriam A. Cavanaugh.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(asc)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Reader - Waiver sent on 10/17/2019. (Seward, T)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by T Joseph Seward on behalf of David Reader. Attorney(s) appearing: T. Joseph Seward (Seward, T)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Gerald Campbell re subpoenas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(bx)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Randall Campbell supporting documents to complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(bx)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Gerald T Campbell. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (ds)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also enclosed consent/refusal forms and service packet (for 4 defendants) (ds)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Gerald T Campbell. (Filing Fee PAID ; MK4689-079576) (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Campbell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall George Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brigette Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miriam A Cavanaugh
Represented By: Thomas Fleury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Reader
Represented By: T Joseph Seward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald T Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?