Braxton v. Aramark et al
Plaintiff: Bradley Tatum Braxton
Defendant: Aramark, Marla Ferguson, Capt David Kiesner, Lt Douglas Verheyen, Outagamie County Jail Employees and Sheriff Clint C Kriewaldt
Case Number: 2:2019cv01371
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/24/2019. Plaintiff not required to pay initial partial filing fee. Plaintiff to notify the court by 11/14/2019 if he wants to voluntarily dismiss case. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Bradley Braxton)(cb)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Bradley Tatum Braxton. (amb)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 SECOND LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days (first letter returned, #4 ). (ds)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Sent to Bradley T Braxton Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate. (ds)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (ds)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Bradley Tatum Braxton. (ds)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Bradley Tatum Braxton. (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braxton v. Aramark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marla Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt David Kiesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Douglas Verheyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outagamie County Jail Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Clint C Kriewaldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Tatum Braxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?