Scales v. Noonan et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Avery Scales
Defendant: Melissa Gonzales, Patrick Noonan, Douglas Wearing, Lt Bradley Friend, City of Racine, Racine Police Department, Deputy Jaeck, Racine County and Deputy Fountaine
Case Number: 2:2019cv01382
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST (Motion) to File Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Phillip Avery Scales; Amended Complaint filed at #15 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vkb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee filed by plaintiff Phillip Avery Scales (vkb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff Phillip Avery Scales(vkb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER from plaintiff requesting subpoenas, information on serving subpoenas, information on if the court can obtain evidence for him and information on how to amend his complaint (vkb)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER from plaintiff re: dollar demand and adding defendants to his case (Attachments: #1 Letter from clerk in response)(vkb)
October 4, 2019 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $7.00, receipt number MK4689-079767; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department. (ds)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST to add defendants by Phillip Avery Scales. (amb)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST to add defendants by Phillip Avery Scales. (amb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Waive the Initial Partial Filing Fee filed by plaintiff Phillip Avery Scales (vkb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 DOCUMENTS RECEIVED from Plaintiff - Copy of letter from attorney declining to represent him (vkb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Phillip Avery Scales. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (vkb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff sending Local Rules and FAQ's (vkb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend Complaint to Add Defendants filed by plaintiff Phillip Avery Scales (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vkb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by plaintiff Phillip Avery Scales (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Envelope)(vkb)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/23/2019. On or before 10/14/2019 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $6.75 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Phillip Scales at Racine County Jail; Racine County Sheriff)(cb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by plaintiff (vkb)
September 20, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk mailed to plaintiff requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Duffin be filed within 21 days(vkb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee filed by plaintiff Phillip Avery Scales (vkb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Phillip Avery Scales (originally filed in error as part of 19cv1360)(vkb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scales v. Noonan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Wearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Bradley Friend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Racine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Racine Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Jaeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Racine County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Fountaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Avery Scales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?