Lemon et al v. Aurora Health Care North Inc et al
Plaintiff: Shamora Lemon
Defendant: M.D. RYAN T. MURPHY, AURORA HEALTH CARE NORTH, INC. d/b/a AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OF MANITOWOC COUNTY, INJURED PATIENTS AND FAMILIES COMPENSATION FUND, BAYCARE CLINIC, L.L.P., D,IO. JEFFREY SCHROEDER, Baycare Clinic LLP, Ryan T Murphy, Aurora Health Care North Inc and Jeffrey Schroeder
Not Yet Classified: CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
Intervenor Plaintiff: STATE OF WISCONSIN DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH SERVICES
Case Number: 2:2019cv01384
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Aurora Health Care North Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Johnson, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aurora Health Care North Inc - Waiver sent on 10/14/2019. (Sulayman, Fuad)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by Shamora Lemon. (Sulayman, Fuad)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Shamora Lemon. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Sulayman, Fuad)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ryan T Murphy - Waiver sent on 9/25/2019. (Sulayman, Fuad)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey Schroeder - Waiver sent on 9/25/2019. (Sulayman, Fuad)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Baycare Clinic LLP - Waiver sent on 9/25/2019. (Sulayman, Fuad)
September 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to Aurora Health Care North Inc, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Injured Patients and Families Compensation Fund, State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services. (bx)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs Shamora Lemon, Individually, et. al (Attachments: #1 Summons CMS Summons, #2 Summons Injured Patients and Families Compensation Fund, #3 Summons State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services)(Sulayman, Fuad)
September 24, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - (DO NOT Capitalize or Add punctuation) Please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (bx)
September 23, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Shamora Lemon. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3225847)(Sulayman, Fuad) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemon et al v. Aurora Health Care North Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. RYAN T. MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA HEALTH CARE NORTH, INC. d/b/a AURORA MEDICAL CENTER OF MANITOWOC COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INJURED PATIENTS AND FAMILIES COMPENSATION FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYCARE CLINIC, L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D,IO. JEFFREY SCHROEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baycare Clinic LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan T Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Health Care North Inc
Represented By: Michael L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shamora Lemon
Represented By: Fuad Sulayman
Represented By: Robert Winter
Represented By: Ann S Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: STATE OF WISCONSIN DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?