Lenz v. Beasla
Plaintiff: Michael Lenz
Defendant: Kirpal Beasla
Case Number: 2:2019cv01423
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Want of Federal Jurisdiction by Michael Lenz. (amb)
November 19, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Kirpal Beasla re #17 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unreported Cases, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Suenram, Christopher)
November 13, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Michael Lenz re #17 MOTION to Dismiss. Titled as "Objection and Exception to Motion to Dismiss." (amb)
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Kirpal Beasla. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix Unreported Cases, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Suenram, Christopher)
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Kirpal Beasla re #12 Declaration Brief in Opposition (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unreported Cases, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Suenram, Christopher)
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 OBJECTIONS by Michael Lenz re #14 Order on Motion for Default Judgment. (amb)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/29/2019 DENYING #8 plaintiff's notice and demand for entry of default for failure to appear. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Michael Lenz) (cb)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER from Michael Lenz addressed to Clerk of Court. Letter received at Clerk of Court's address. (amb)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Trespass on Sovereignty by Michael Lenz. (amb)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Wrongdoing and Demand for Redress by Michael Lenz. (amb)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher F Suenram on behalf of Kirpal Beasla. Attorney(s) appearing: Christopher Francis Suenram (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Suenram, Christopher)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER from the Court to plaintiff in response to plaintiff's email. (cc: All Counsel, via US Mail to plaintiff) (Attachments: #1 Email from Michael Lenz)(amb)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Default for Failure to Appear by Michael Lenz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(amb)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTIONS And Exception to Void Order by Michael Lenz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(bx)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Michael Lenz. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (amb)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/1/2019 re #3 Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. The court GRANTS the defendant's motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendant to file an answer or a responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on November 12, 2019. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Michael Lenz) (cb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kirpal Beasla. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Phillips, Harris)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Kirpal Beasla. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Harris)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER regarding magistrate form (jcl)
September 30, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kirpal Beasla from Wisconsin Circuit Court for Waukesha County, Case Number: 2019-cv-001348 with attached state court documents. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, Summons, Exhibits, and Notice, #3 State Court Amended Complaint and Exhibit)(Phillips, Harris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lenz v. Beasla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirpal Beasla
Represented By: Harris J Phillips
Represented By: Christopher F Suenram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?