United States of America v. All Funds Deposited into the United States Department of Justice's Seized Asset Deposit Fund for 19-DCI-000029 under the March 1 2019 Restraining Order issued in Case No 18-CR-62 (ED Wis)
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: All Funds Deposited into the United States Department of Justice's Seized Asset Deposit Fund for 19-DCI-000029 under the March 1 2019 Restraining Order issued in Case No 18-CR-62 (ED Wis)
Case Number: 2:2019cv01436
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Campbell, Scott)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 US Marshal 285 Form executed - defendant funds in USMS custody (Campbell, Scott)
October 2, 2019 Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued (bx)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from AUSA Scott J. Campbell to Clerk of Court. (Campbell, Scott)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America to Brian Ganos of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by United States of America to Sonag Company, Inc. of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United States of America. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Campbell, Scott)
October 1, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Civil Forfeiture In Rem against All Funds Deposited into the United States Department of Justice's Seized Asset Deposit Fund for 19-DCI-000029 under the March 1 2019 Restraining Order issued in Case No 18-CR-62 (ED Wis) by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Warrant for Arrest in Rem)(Campbell, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. All Funds Deposited into the United States Department of Justice's Seized Asset Deposit Fund for 19-DCI-000029 under the March 1 2019 Restraining Order issued in Case No 18-CR-62 (ED Wis)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Funds Deposited into the United States Department of Justice's Seized Asset Deposit Fund for 19-DCI-000029 under the March 1 2019 Restraining Order issued in Case No 18-CR-62 (ED Wis)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Scott J Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?