Conner v. Yakes et al
Plaintiff: Bryan C Conner
Defendant: Lifestar Emergency Medical Services LLC, Theresa Grube and Travis Yakes
Case Number: 2:2019cv01457
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $94.93, receipt number MK4689-080233. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER from Mr. Conner re: the trust account he sent in and his letter. (copy of his docket report sent to him.) (mlm)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/21/2019, that on or before 11/12/2019 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 94.93 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, Warden)(mlm)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Bryan C Conner. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mlm)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Bryan Conner re: he returned to prison on 6/13/2019 so he does not have a trust account statement for April, May and the beginning of June. (mlm)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from the clerk to Mr. Conner requesting that the consent/refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 21 days. Also requesting full six month trust account statement or the missing months of April, May and June. (kah)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Preserve and Produce by Bryan C Conner. (kah)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Partial Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Bryan C Conner. (kah) Modified on 10/4/2019 (kah).
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Bryan C Conner. (kah)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against Theresa Grube, Lifestar Emergency Medical Services LLC, Travis Yakes by Bryan C Conner. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Letter)(kah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conner v. Yakes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifestar Emergency Medical Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Yakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan C Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?