Bashinski v. Central Portfolio Control Inc
Plaintiff: Mary Bashinski
Defendant: Central Portfolio Control Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01468
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Mary Bashinski. (Miller, Heidi)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/4/19. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on 12/18/19 at 11:30 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
October 30, 2019 Due to non-consent of the parties this case is being randomly reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (ds)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Central Portfolio Control Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Poncin, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Central Portfolio Control Inc.(Poncin, Michael)
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Mary Bashinski. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Miller, Heidi)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Mary Bashinski. (Miller, Heidi)
October 8, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
October 8, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Central Portfolio Control Inc. (Poncin, Michael)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Central Portfolio Control Inc from Waukesha County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2019CV001636 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3242039) (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(Poncin, Michael)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Minute Entry for Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph: The court addresses additional questions as to the now fully briefed petition for writ of habeas corpus. Respondent to supplement their responsive pleading as to the removal status of petitioner no later than October 9, 2019. (Tape #12:02:33-12:23:48) (asc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bashinski v. Central Portfolio Control Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Portfolio Control Inc
Represented By: Michael S Poncin
Represented By: Bradley R Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Bashinski
Represented By: Heidi N Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?