Johnson v. Healthstat Inc
Plaintiff: Stephanie Johnson
Defendant: Healthstat, Inc. and Healthstat Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01484
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Healthstat Inc - Waiver sent on 10/11/2019. (McDonald, Shannon)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Stephanie Johnson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (McDonald, Shannon)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE by Stephanie Johnson Certificate of Interest (McDonald, Shannon)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon D McDonald on behalf of Stephanie Johnson. Attorney(s) appearing: Shannon D. McDonald (McDonald, Shannon)
October 10, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Stephanie Johnson. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3245202) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kloth, Christopher) Modified on 10/13/2019 (lz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Healthstat Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Johnson
Represented By: Christopher M Kloth
Represented By: Shannon D McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthstat, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthstat Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?