Thicklen et al v. LindenGrove Inc
Plaintiff: Kemonisha Spicer and Sonya R Thicklen
Defendant: LindenGrove, Inc. and LindenGrove Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01500
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (ds)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by LindenGrove Inc. (Erickson, Elizabeth)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by LindenGrove Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Erickson, Elizabeth)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (McDonald, Shannon)
November 4, 2019 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to Plaintiffs requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed no later than November 18, 2019 ; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (ds)
October 16, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendant requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov. (ds)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A Erickson on behalf of LindenGrove Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Elizabeth A. Erickson (Erickson, Elizabeth)
October 15, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #3 Certificate filed by Kemonisha Spicer, Sonya R Thicklen ; The incorrect event was chosen; The correct event was Disclosure Statement. This document does not need to be re-filed. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (blr)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LindenGrove, Inc. - Waiver sent on 10/14/2019. (McDonald, Shannon)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement CERTIFICATE by All Plaintiffs Certificate of Interest (McDonald, Shannon) Modified on 10/15/2019 (blr).
October 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon D McDonald on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Shannon D. McDonald (McDonald, Shannon)
October 11, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against LindenGrove, Inc. by Sonya R Thicklen, Kemonisha Spicer. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3246947) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kloth, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thicklen et al v. LindenGrove Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kemonisha Spicer
Represented By: Christopher M Kloth
Represented By: Shannon D McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya R Thicklen
Represented By: Christopher M Kloth
Represented By: Shannon D McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LindenGrove, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LindenGrove Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth A Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?