Ruffin-Traylor et al v. Butler et al
Plaintiff: Natalie Ruffin-Traylor
Defendant: Mary Lemmenes, Karen Lind Butler, Visiting Nurse Community Care Inc, Joann Medley, CK, Autumn Mercer, Kenosha County, Kelly O'Brien, Unknown Nurse Employees of VNNC/KVNA, Unknown Sheriff Supervisors and Correctional Officers of the Kenosha County Sheriff's Department, Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc and Kenosha Visiting Nurse Association
Not Yet Classified: Andrea Palm and Alex M Azar, II
Case Number: 2:2019cv01521
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 27 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Mary Lemmenes, Kelly O'Brien. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Grzebielski, Kevin)
December 5, 2019 Filing 26 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Cerjak, Michael)
December 5, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Potter on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Rachel E. Potter (Potter, Rachel)
December 4, 2019 Filing 24 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Karen Lind Butler. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Just, Jason)
December 4, 2019 Filing 23 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Knott, Douglas)
December 4, 2019 Filing 22 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrea Palm. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Schuh, Dennis)
December 3, 2019 Filing 21 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Alex M Azar, II. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Warwick, Lisa)
December 3, 2019 Filing 20 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by All Plaintiffs served upon Matthew D. Krueger/U.S. Department of Justice on 11/02/2019 (Cerjak, Michael)
December 3, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa T Warwick on behalf of Alex M Azar, II. Attorney(s) appearing: Lisa T. Warwick (Warwick, Lisa)
December 2, 2019 Filing 18 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by All Plaintiffs served upon William Pelham Barr/U.S. Department of Justice on 11/07/2019 (Cerjak, Michael)
December 2, 2019 Filing 17 ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint on 11/14/2019 by Kelly O'Brien, M.D. (Cerjak, Michael)
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint on 11/04/2019 by Karen Lind Butler, M.D. (Cerjak, Michael)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin L Grzebielski on behalf of Mary Lemmenes, Kelly O'Brien. Attorney(s) appearing: Kevin L. Grzebielski (Grzebielski, Kevin)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Mary Lemmenes, Kelly O'Brien.(Grzebielski, Kevin)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R Starnes on behalf of Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Charles R. Starnes (Starnes, Charles)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah M Kidd on behalf of Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Sarah M. Kidd (Kidd, Sarah)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support filed by Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc re #10 MOTION to Dismiss . (Knott, Douglas)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc. (Knott, Douglas)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas S Knott on behalf of Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Douglas S. Knott (Knott, Douglas)
November 25, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to ALL PARTIES requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Karen Lind Butler. (Just, Jason)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Karen Lind Butler.(Just, Jason)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R Just on behalf of Karen Lind Butler. Attorney(s) appearing: Jason R. Just (Just, Jason)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Andrea Palm Notice of Lien (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service DHS Certificate of Service)(Schuh, Dennis)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis C Schuh on behalf of Andrea Palm. Attorney(s) appearing: Dennis C. Schuh (Schuh, Dennis)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Cerjak, Michael)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A Peterson on behalf of Natalie Ruffin-Traylor. Attorney(s) appearing: Mark A. Peterson (Peterson, Mark)
October 22, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
October 16, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Natalie Ruffin-Traylor. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3250313) (Attachments: #1 Summons to Kenosha County, #2 Summons to Mary Lemmenes, #3 Summons to Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc., #4 Summons to Karen Lind Butler, #5 Summons to Visiting Nurse Community Care, Inc., #6 Summons to Autumn Mercer, #7 Summons to Kelly O'Brien, #8 Summons to Kenosha Visiting Nurse Association, Inc., #9 Summons to Alex M. Azar, II, #10 Summons to Andrea Palm)(Cerjak, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2019: #11 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl). Modified on 10/22/2019 (asc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruffin-Traylor et al v. Butler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Lemmenes
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Lind Butler
Represented By: Jason R Just
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visiting Nurse Community Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joann Medley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autumn Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenosha County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly O'Brien
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Nurse Employees of VNNC/KVNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Sheriff Supervisors and Correctional Officers of the Kenosha County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc
Represented By: Sarah M Kidd
Represented By: Charles R Starnes
Represented By: Douglas S Knott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenosha Visiting Nurse Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Ruffin-Traylor
Represented By: Michael J Cerjak
Represented By: Rachel Potter
Represented By: Mark A Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Andrea Palm
Represented By: Dennis C Schuh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Alex M Azar, II
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?