Empower Movement Physical Therapy LLC v. Rush et al
Plaintiff: Empower Movement Physical Therapy, LLC and Empower Movement Physical Therapy LLC
Defendant: Lindsay Rush, Beyond Physical Therapy, LLC and Beyond Physical Therapy LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01559
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Joel S. Aziere ISO Defendant's Reply Brief iso Their Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Decision)(Aziere, Joel)
December 19, 2019 Filing 31 BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #19 MOTION to Dismiss . (Aziere, Joel)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/11/19. Amended Pleadings due by 1/30/20. Discovery due by 4/30/20. Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 2/1/20. Defendants Expert Witness List due by 3/1/20. Dispositive Motions due by 5/29/20. Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 12/30/19. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
December 11, 2019 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman: Scheduling Conference held on 12/11/2019. Court to adopt parties' proposed schedule. (jad)
December 5, 2019 Filing 28 APPENDIX by Empower Movement Physical Therapy LLC of Non-Published Authority. (Piefer, Sally)
December 5, 2019 Filing 27 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Empower Movement Physical Therapy LLC re #19 MOTION to Dismiss . (Piefer, Sally)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Regarding Confidentiality signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/25/19. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/25/19. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
November 22, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION by All Defendants. (Aziere, Joel)
November 20, 2019 Filing 23 Preliminary Pretrial REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Empower Movement Physical Therapy LLC. (Piefer, Sally)
November 15, 2019 Filing 22 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Empower Movement Physical Therapy LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Wood, Samantha)
November 14, 2019 Filing 21 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Beyond Physical Therapy LLC, Lindsay Rush. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Aziere, Joel)
November 14, 2019 Filing 20 BRIEF in Support filed by Beyond Physical Therapy LLC, Lindsay Rush re #19 MOTION to Dismiss . (Aziere, Joel)
November 14, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Beyond Physical Therapy LLC, Lindsay Rush. (Aziere, Joel)
November 13, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman: Status Conference held on 11/13/2019. Parties and court discuss plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order/preliminary injunction. With the agreement of the defendants, the court GRANTS IN PART the motion for preliminary injunction #3 , as follows: The defendants are enjoined from using Empower's customer list to contact Empower patients that Beyond Physical Therapy has not already contacted or begun treating; in all other respects, the motion is DENIED. Empower's motion for a temporary restraining order #3 is also DENIED. A Rule 16 scheduling conference will be held telephonically on December 11, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. The parties shall confer under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) prior to the scheduling conference and submit a proposed discovery plan to the court. (Court Reporter Susan Ambruster.) (jad)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/4/19. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic status conference will be held on November 13, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. The court will initiate the call. Counsel must email the court prior to the call at AdelmanPO@wied.uscourts.gov to provide contact information. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Beyond Physical Therapy LLC, Lindsay Rush to Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Aziere, Joel)
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Thomas Howald (Supplemental) (Piefer, Sally)
November 1, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Empower Movement Physical Therapy LLC re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Piefer, Sally)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Civil Cover Sheet; Summons & Complaint; NOM and Motion for TRO and Prelim Injunction; K. Howald Decl.; T. Howald Decl.; Proposed Order; Corp. Discl. Stmt. on 10/24/18 by Joel S. Aziere (Piefer, Sally)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Saveon D Grenell on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Saveon D. Grenell (Grenell, Saveon)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett D Schnepper on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Brett D. Schnepper (Schnepper, Brett)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Defendants re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Preliminary Response and Request for Limited Expedited Discovery. (Aziere, Joel)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Aziere, Joel)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel S Aziere on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Joel S. Aziere (Aziere, Joel)
October 24, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED Order Granting TRO filed by Empower Movement Physical Therapy, LLC. (Piefer, Sally) Modified on 10/25/2019 (bx).
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Thomas Howald (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Offer Letter, #2 Exhibit B. Confidentiality & Non-Competition Agreement)(Piefer, Sally)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Krystle Howald (Piefer, Sally)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support filed by Empower Movement Physical Therapy, LLC re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction . (Piefer, Sally)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Empower Movement Physical Therapy, LLC. (Piefer, Sally). Modified on 10/25/2019 (bx).
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Empower Movement Physical Therapy, LLC. (Piefer, Sally)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Beyond Physical Therapy, LLC, Lindsay Rush by Empower Movement Physical Therapy, LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3258494) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Confidentiality & Non-Competition Agrmt.)(Piefer, Sally) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Empower Movement Physical Therapy LLC v. Rush et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Empower Movement Physical Therapy, LLC
Represented By: Sally A Piefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Empower Movement Physical Therapy LLC
Represented By: Sally A Piefer
Represented By: Samantha J Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay Rush
Represented By: Brett D Schnepper
Represented By: Saveon D Grenell
Represented By: Joel S Aziere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beyond Physical Therapy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beyond Physical Therapy LLC
Represented By: Brett D Schnepper
Represented By: Saveon D Grenell
Represented By: Joel S Aziere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?