Medina v. Regional Management Corp
Plaintiff: Damita Medina
Defendant: Regional Management Corp. and Regional Management Corp
Case Number: 2:2019cv01564
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tony H McGrath on behalf of Regional Management Corp. Attorney(s) appearing: Tony H. McGrath (McGrath, Tony)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Regional Management Corp - Waiver sent on 11/2/2019. (Luzi, Scott)
October 28, 2019 Summons Issued as to Regional Management Corp. (bx)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Damita Medina. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Luzi, Scott)
October 25, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S Luzi on behalf of Damita Medina. Attorney(s) appearing: Scott S. Luzi, James A. Walcheske (Luzi, Scott)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Damita Medina. (Luzi, Scott)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Regional Management Corp. by Damita Medina. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3259377) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Damita Medina Consent to Join Form)(Luzi, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medina v. Regional Management Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Management Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Management Corp
Represented By: Tony H McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damita Medina
Represented By: Scott S Luzi
Represented By: James A Walcheske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?