Bulk Container Group LLC et al v. Peterson
Plaintiff: Bulk Container Group LLC and Ian Zaretzky
Defendant: Aaron J Peterson
Case Number: 2:2019cv01570
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Conversion
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/9/2020. Case DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 8, 2020 Filing 36 LETTER from Matthew R. Jelenchick reporting completed settlement. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Dismissal)(Jelenchick, Matthew)
August 11, 2020 Filing 35 Court Minute for proceedings held before Chief Judge Pamela Pepper: Status Conference held on 8/11/2020. ( Status Conference set for 9/8/2020 01:30 PM By Telephone before Chief Judge Pamela Pepper.) The parties are to call the court's conference line at 888-557-8511 and use the access code 4893665#. (kgw)
August 11, 2020 Filing 34 Audio of status conference held on 08/11/2020 at 11:33 a.m.; File Size (2.1 MB) (kgw)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 7/7/2020. The parties contacted the court's chambers and indicated that they would file their settlement documents within 20 days. The court ORDERS that the status conference scheduled for 7/7/2020 at 1:30 p.m. is REMOVED from the calendar. The court will schedule a hearing in about 30 days to ensure the parties have filed their settlement documents. If the parties file their settlement documents prior to the scheduled hearing, the court will remove the hearing from the calendar. Note: There is no document associated with the text only order. (cc: all counsel)(kgw)
July 7, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 8/11/2020 11:30 AM By Telephone before Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. The parties are to call the court's conference line at 888-557-8511 and use the access code 4893665#. (cc: all counsel)(kgw)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/13/2020. #29 Stipulation on Settlement APPROVED. #31 Joint motion for entry of order on stipulated settlement GRANTED. JP Morgan Chase to lift restrictions and distribute funds as ordered. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
May 11, 2020 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Settlement for Entry of Order on Stipulated Settlement by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jelenchick, Matthew)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/11/2020. The parties have filed a report on the outcome of the early neutral evaluation in this case, indicating that they have entered into a settlement and expect all conditions to be completed by June 15, 2020, and asking the court to keep the hearing scheduled for July 7, 2020 on the docket as a status in the event there are matters that need to be addressed in order to close the case. Dkt. No. 28 The court GRANTS the parties' request and ORDERS that the motion hearing is CONVERTED to a Status Conference set for July 7, 2020 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Parties wishing to appear by phone may do so by calling the court's conference line at 888-557-8511 and using access code 4893665#. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
May 11, 2020 Motions terminated: #4 plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction; #10 plaintiff's motion for default judgment; #12 defendant's motion to dismiss; #13 defendant's motion to vacate default judgment. Termed per notice of settlement, dkt. no. 28. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
May 8, 2020 Filing 29 STIPULATION on Settlement by All Plaintiffs. (Jelenchick, Matthew)
May 8, 2020 Filing 28 STATUS REPORT on Settlement by All Plaintiffs. (Jelenchick, Matthew)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/29/2020. Plaintiff's counsel filed a report as to the status of this case after the parties engaged in mediation, indicating that they have made progress toward a settlement and that they would like to continue negotiations in the upcoming week. Dkt. No. 26. The court appreciates the update from the parties and ORDERS that if the case has not settled by May 4, 2020, the parties are to file either another status report or the briefs due on the pending motions. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
April 28, 2020 Filing 26 STATUS REPORT on ENE Referral by All Plaintiffs. (Jelenchick, Matthew)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/21/2020 re #23 Stipulation for Referral to Early Neutral Evaluation and #24 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Briefs. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation for referral to early neutral evaluation. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation for an extension of time to file reply briefs to the extent that the court ORDERS that if the parties have not filed reply briefs by April 24, 2020, they shall file a joint report updating the court as to the status of the case and the progress of the early neutral evaluation. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
February 19, 2020 Filing 24 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Reply Briefs by Bulk Container Group LLC, Ian Zaretzky. (Jelenchick, Matthew)
February 19, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION For Referral to Early Neutral Evaluation by Bulk Container Group LLC, Ian Zaretzky. (Jelenchick, Matthew)
February 18, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Aaron J Peterson re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sumsion, Steve)
February 18, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aaron J Peterson (Sumsion, Steve)
February 6, 2020 Filing 20 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Aaron J Peterson re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sumsion, Steve)
February 5, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Matthew R. Jelenchick in Opposition to Motion to Vacate Default Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 12/18/19 Notice Email re: Default)(Jelenchick, Matthew)
February 5, 2020 Filing 18 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Bulk Container Group LLC, Ian Zaretzky re #13 MOTION to Vacate Default Judgment . (Jelenchick, Matthew)
February 3, 2020 Filing 17 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Bulk Container Group LLC, Ian Zaretzky re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Jelenchick, Matthew)
January 23, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing on #4 plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #10 plaintiff's motion for default judgment #12 defendant's motion to dismiss #13 defendant's motion to vacate default judgment set for 7/7/2020 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Parties wishing to appear by phone may do so by calling the court's conference line at 888-557-8511 and using access code 4839665#. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
January 16, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Aaron J Peterson re #10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to AARON J. PETERSON . (Sumsion, Steve)
January 15, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF in Support filed by Aaron J Peterson re #13 MOTION to Vacate Default Judgment . (Sumsion, Steve)
January 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Vacate Default Judgment by Aaron J Peterson. (Sumsion, Steve)
January 14, 2020 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Aaron J Peterson; The description of the attachments contains duplicate text. In the future, when attaching documents to the main document you may select a description from the category drop-down list but then you should not repeat that word in the description text box. For example, if you choose Exhibit from the drop-down list, then you may simply type A in the description text box and Exhibit A will appear on the docket. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (vkb)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibt A Articles of Organization, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B BCG Business Depository Certificate)(Sumsion, Steve)
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Ian Zaretzky in Support of Default Judgment (Jelenchick, Matthew)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to AARON J. PETERSON by Bulk Container Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Default Judgment and Judgment)(Jelenchick, Matthew)
January 2, 2020 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Aaron J Peterson. (vkb)
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to AARON J. PETERSON by Bulk Container Group LLC, Ian Zaretzky. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Entry of Default)(Jelenchick, Matthew)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bulk Container Group LLC, Ian Zaretzky of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and supporting Brief and Declaration (Jelenchick, Matthew)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Aaron J Peterson served on 11/26/2019. (Jelenchick, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to Aaron J Peterson (vkb)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Ian Zaretzky (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A-Zaretzky LinkedIn Profile, #3 Exhibit B-Bulk Container Group LLC Articles of Organization Wisconsin, #4 Exhibit C-BCG Website, #5 Exhibit D-BCG Business Card and Form Invoice, #6 Exhibit E-BCG Promotional Apparel and Items, #7 Exhibit F-BCG Operating Agreement, #8 Exhibit G-Petersons 10/1/19 Email Plan, #9 Exhibit H-Chase Bank Withdrawal Slip Signed by Peterson, #10 Exhibit I-Bulk Container Group LLC Certificate of Organization - Utah, #11 Exhibit J-Fraud Report to Chase Bank, #12 Exhibit K-Chase Bank Notice Freezing Account, #13 Exhibit L-Petersons LinkedIn Conversation, #14 Exhibit M-Petersons LinkedIn Profile, #15 Exhibit N-Zaretzky Ghost LinkedIn Profile, #16 Exhibit O-BCGs LinkedIn Profile, #17 Exhibit P-Website Content for www.fulfilledby.io and Petersons vimeo Channel, #18 Exhibit Q-Website Content for www.fulfilledby.us, #19 Exhibit R-My Mini Casa, LLC Yelp and BBB Reviews)(Jelenchick, Matthew)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Jelenchick, Matthew)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Jelenchick, Matthew)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Jelenchick, Matthew)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Jelenchick, Matthew)
October 28, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aaron J Peterson by Bulk Container Group LLC, Ian Zaretzky. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3260241)(Jelenchick, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bulk Container Group LLC et al v. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bulk Container Group LLC
Represented By: Matthew R Jelenchick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Zaretzky
Represented By: Matthew R Jelenchick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron J Peterson
Represented By: Steve Sumsion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?