Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC v. Stewart
Plaintiff: Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC
Defendant: Robert D. Stewart and Robert D Stewart
Case Number: 2:2019cv01600
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Granting #10 Leave to File Amended Complaint signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/19/19. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) with Jury Demand against Robert D Stewart filed by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC.(Wamelink, Seth)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC. (Wamelink, Seth)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks Harlow on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Brooks E. Harlow (Harlow, Brooks)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/2/19 granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
December 2, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #8 Unopposed MOTION for Order (Proposed) Extending Defendant's Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC, #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC ; Proposed Orders should be e-filed as an attachment to the stipulation or motion and NOT e-filed as a separate document. Please ensure that the proposed order has been emailed to the proposed email box for the assigned judge in Word or WordPerfect format. This document does not need to be re-filedThe incorrect event was chosen; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (bx)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER Unopposed MOTION for Order Extending Defendant's Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC. (Wamelink, Seth) Modified on 12/2/2019 (bx).
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC. (Wamelink, Seth)
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC. Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC served on 11/7/2019. (Wamelink, Seth)
November 8, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (blr)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Wamelink, Seth)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC. (Wamelink, Seth)
November 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to Robert D Stewart (two locations). (ds)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC (Wamelink, Seth)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC (Wamelink, Seth)
October 31, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The attached summons was not saved in a fillable format and cannot be issued electronically. Please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the # summons instructions for further guidance. (ds)
October 30, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Robert D. Stewart by Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3264003) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - F, #2 Summons Walworth, WI Address, #3 Summons Fontana-On-Geneva Lake, WI Address, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wamelink, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC v. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D Stewart
Represented By: Brooks Harlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Signals Acquisitions II LLC
Represented By: Seth Wamelink
Represented By: John Q Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?