Jimenez et al v. Illini Precast LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ginder R Lopez, Omar A Nunez, Everardo E Torres, Agustin jimenez, Leonardo jimenez, Leopoldo Jimenez, Everardo Estrada Torres, Ginder Rivera Lopez and Omar Arreguin Nunez
Defendant: Illini Precast, LLC, Wegenbach Craig, Illini Precast LLC and Craig Wegenbach
Case Number: 2:2019cv01623
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 12/20/2019. Interim Settlement Report due by 6/25/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2020; Final Settlement Report due by 10/13/2020; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 10/16/2020; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 10/21/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/27/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(km)
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 12/20/2019 (Court Reporter John Schindhelm) (km)
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE Statement by Illini Precast LLC, Craig Wegenbach. (Stadler, Ronald)
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Plaintiffs and by Illini Precast LLC, Craig Wegenbach. (Stadler, Ronald)
December 16, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Illini Precast LLC, Craig Wegenbach.(Stadler, Ronald) Modified on 12/16/2019 (jcl).
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 12/17/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan E Sacks on behalf of Illini Precast LLC, Craig Wegenbach. Attorney(s) appearing: Jonathan Sacks (Sacks, Jonathan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald S Stadler on behalf of Illini Precast LLC, Craig Wegenbach. Attorney(s) appearing: Ronald Stadler (Stadler, Ronald)
November 15, 2019 Summons Issued as to Illini Precast LLC, Craig Wegenbach. (asc)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Mihelich, Robert)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Mihelich, Robert)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs filed by Everardo Estrada Torres, Agustin Jimenez, Ginder Rivera Lopez, Leopoldo Jimenez, Omar Arreguin Nunez.(Mihelich, Robert)
November 6, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error. The summons forms docketed (ECF nos. #3 and #4 ) were not prepared using the updated version found on our website. Please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance. (amb)
November 6, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified: added proper punctuation to party names, corrected party names as reflected by complaint, removed addresses from party names. Please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance. (amb)
November 5, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (amb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Mihelich, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Mihelich, Robert)
November 5, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Mihelich, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Mihelich, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Wegenbach Craig, Illini Precast, LLC by Agustin jimenez, Ginder R Lopez, Leonardo jimenez, Omar A Nunez. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3268794) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint Exhibit A-Consent Forms)(Mihelich, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez et al v. Illini Precast LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginder R Lopez
Represented By: Robert M Mihelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar A Nunez
Represented By: Robert M Mihelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everardo E Torres
Represented By: Robert M Mihelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agustin jimenez
Represented By: Robert M Mihelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonardo jimenez
Represented By: Robert M Mihelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leopoldo Jimenez
Represented By: Robert M Mihelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everardo Estrada Torres
Represented By: Robert M Mihelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginder Rivera Lopez
Represented By: Robert M Mihelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Arreguin Nunez
Represented By: Robert M Mihelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illini Precast, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wegenbach Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illini Precast LLC
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Wegenbach
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?