Keen Edge Company, Inc. v. Wright Manufacturing Inc
Plaintiff: Keen Edge Company, Inc. and Keen Edge Company Inc
Defendant: Wright Manufacturing Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01673
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Approving Stipulation #17 signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/7/20. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
January 3, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION by Wright Manufacturing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Goldwater McCoy, Ruth)
January 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Wright Manufacturing Inc Notice of Withdrawal (Brenner, Laura)
December 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruth E Goldwater McCoy on behalf of Wright Manufacturing Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Ruth E. Goldwater McCoy (Goldwater McCoy, Ruth)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Wright Manufacturing Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Murphy, Daniel)
December 3, 2019 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Keen Edge Company Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Mandell, Jeffrey)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Stipulation re temporary restraining order and extension of time signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/26/19. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION by Wright Manufacturing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order )(Brenner, Laura) Modified on 11/26/2019 (jcl).
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by Wright Manufacturing Inc. (Brenner, Laura)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura A Brenner on behalf of Wright Manufacturing Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Laura A. Brenner (Brenner, Laura)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G Murphy on behalf of Wright Manufacturing Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel Murphy (Murphy, Daniel)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Richard Asaro (Process Server) . (Mandell, Jeffrey)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt Simatic on behalf of Keen Edge Company, Inc.. Attorney(s) appearing: Kurt Simatic (Simatic, Kurt)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Keen Edge Company, Inc.. (Mandell, Jeffrey)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of William Burke, Sr. (Mandell, Jeffrey)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF in Support filed by Keen Edge Company, Inc. re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1--Unreported Case)(Mandell, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/14/2019 (jcl).
November 13, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Keen Edge Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mandell, Jeffrey)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Wright Manufacturing Inc by Keen Edge Company, Inc.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3276649) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Wright Manufacturing Letter, #2 Exhibit B--Notice of Termination, #3 Exhibit C--Email of 10-29-19, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet )(Mandell, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/14/2019 (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keen Edge Company, Inc. v. Wright Manufacturing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Manufacturing Inc
Represented By: Laura A Brenner
Represented By: Ruth E Goldwater McCoy
Represented By: Daniel G Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keen Edge Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt Simatic
Represented By: Jeffrey A Mandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keen Edge Company Inc
Represented By: Kurt Simatic
Represented By: Jeffrey A Mandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?