Jackson v. Anderson
Plaintiff: Tony Jackson
Defendant: Melissa Anderson
Case Number: 2:2019cv01759
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Waive Initial Partial Filing Fee by Tony Jackson. (asc)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before 1/6/2020 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 11.60 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, warden)(asc)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Tony Jackson. (asc)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Tony Jackson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (asc)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Tony Jackson. (asc)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against Melissa Anderson by Tony Jackson. (asc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Anderson
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?