Lucas v. Milwaukee County Jail
Plaintiff: Georvaughn M Lucas
Defendant: Milwaukee County Jail
Case Number: 2:2019cv01779
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER from Plaintiff regarding his initial partial filing fee and case 19-CV-1619. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Request, #2 Envelope)(kah)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Georvaughn M Lucas. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (kah)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/6/2019. On or before 12/30/2019 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $32.20 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Georvaughn Lucas and Racine County Sheriff)(cb)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (amb)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Georvaughn M Lucas. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(amb)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Georvaughn M Lucas. (amb)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against Milwaukee County Jail by Georvaughn M Lucas. (amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas v. Milwaukee County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georvaughn M Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County Jail
Represented By: Milwaukee County - 550, 555
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?