Danaher Corporation v. Gardner Denver Inc et al
Plaintiff: Danaher Corporation
Defendant: Gardner Denver Inc and Michael Weatherred
Case Number: 2:2019cv01794
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 41 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Danaher Corporation re #29 MOTION to Dismiss . (Hansen, Timothy)
January 21, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Dane H Butswinkas on behalf of Danaher Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Dane H. Butswinkas (Butswinkas, Dane)
January 17, 2020 Filing 39 REDACTION by Danaher Corporation to #38 Declaration,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email Correspondence)(Hansen, Timothy)
January 17, 2020 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Nicholas Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email Correspondence)This document and/or certain attachments are SEALED and only viewable by permission of the court(Hansen, Timothy)
January 17, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Danaher Corporation re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Hansen, Timothy)
January 17, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION to Seal Document Supporting its Reply in Support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Danaher Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Timothy)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 1/16/20. Interim Settlement Report due by 6/10/20; Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/20; Final Settlement Report due by 10/19/20; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 10/23/20; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 10/28/20. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 11/9/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(cl)
January 16, 2020 Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 1/16/2020. (Court Reporter John Schindhelm) (cl)
January 15, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas S Chapman on behalf of Danaher Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Thomas S. Chapman (Chapman, Thomas)
January 15, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by David S Blatt on behalf of Danaher Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: David S. Blatt (Blatt, David)
January 13, 2020 Filing 31 Joint Preliminary REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Danaher Corporation. (Hansen, Timothy)
January 10, 2020 Filing 30 BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #29 MOTION to Dismiss . (Parsons, Ryan)
January 10, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Parsons, Ryan)
January 7, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J Wronski on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew J. Wronski (Wronski, Andrew)
January 7, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate E Gehl on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Kate E. Gehl (Gehl, Kate)
January 3, 2020 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Michael Weatherred in Support of Brief in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Smiley Face Internet Search, #2 Exhibit B - Initial Sketch of Sheet 33)(Parsons, Ryan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Ryan N. Parsons in Support of Brief in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Danaher PowerPoint Presentation)(Parsons, Ryan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 24 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Parsons, Ryan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by John Birmingham, Jr on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: John F. Birmingham Jr. (Birmingham, John)
December 30, 2019 Filing 22 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Danaher Corporation. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Hansen, Timothy)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 12/30/2019 GRANTING #14 Parties' Joint Request for Entry of a Protective Order and SPECIFYING the terms as modified for confidential information produced or disclosed during this matter. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
December 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 1/13/2020. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 12/26/2019 ADOPTING #17 Parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time. By 1/10/2020, Defendants Gardner Denver Inc and Michael Weatherred shall answer or otherwise respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
December 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Danaher Corporation of Correction to Factual Missstatement in Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Expedited Discovery (Hansen, Timothy)
December 24, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #11 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Expedite Discovery . (Parsons, Ryan)
December 24, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by All Defendants. (Parsons, Ryan)
December 19, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Gardner Denver, Inc. (Hansen, Timothy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danaher Corporation. Michael Weatherred served on 12/13/2019. (Hansen, Timothy)
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Expedite , Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Danaher Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order)(Hansen, Timothy)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Parsons, Ryan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan N Parsons on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Ryan N. Parsons (Parsons, Ryan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Danaher Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First set of Requests for Production of Documents, #2 Exhibit B - First Set of Interrogatories, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit Certification of David S. Blatt)(Hansen, Timothy)
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 REDACTION by Danaher Corporation to #9 Declaration. (Hansen, Timothy)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Nicholas Johnson This document and/or certain attachments are SEALED and only viewable by permission of the court(Hansen, Timothy)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 REDACTION by Danaher Corporation to #7 Brief in Support of Motion,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Danaher Template, #2 Exhibit 2 - Gardner Denver Copycat, #3 Exhibit 3 - March 2019 Investor Day Presentation, #4 Exhibit 4 - Weatherred Proprietary Interest Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Gardner Denver 2018 10-K, #6 Exhibit 6 - June 25, 2018 Ltr. from Birmingham to Puma, #7 Exhibit 7 - June 11, 2018 Ltr. from Puma to Weatherred, #8 Exhibit 8 - June 11, 2018 Ltr. from Puma to Gardner Denver, #9 Exhibit 9 - Gardner Denver Morgan Stanley Laguna Stmt., #10 Exhibit 10 - Gardner Denver Q3 2018 Earnings Call Transcript, #11 Exhibit 11 - Nov. 1, 2019 Ltr. from Blatt to Birmingham, #12 Exhibit 12 - Nov. 22, 2019 Ltr. from Birmingham to Blatt, #13 Exhibit 13 - Nov. 22, 2019 Ltr. from Birmingham to Blatt with Attachment, #14 Exhibit 14 - Dec. 8, 2019 Birmingham Email to Blatt with Attachment, #15 Exhibit 15 - Dec. 9, 2019 Blatt Email to Birmingham with Attachment, #16 Exhibit 16 - Dec. 12, 2019 Blatt-Birmingham Email Exchange, #17 Exhibit 17 - Gardner Denver May 2019 Investor Presentation, #18 Exhibit 18 - Danahers Instruments of Change, #19 Exhibit 19 -QDIP Examples, #20 Exhibit 20 - Reynal Proprietary Interest Agreement)(Hansen, Timothy)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support filed by Danaher Corporation re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Danaher Template, #2 Exhibit 2 - Gardner Denver Copycat, #3 Exhibit 3 - March 2019 Investor Day Presentation, #4 Exhibit 4 - Weatherred Proprietary Interest Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Gardner Denver 2018 10-k, #6 Exhibit 6 - June 25, 2018 Letter from Birmingham to Puma, #7 Exhibit 7 - June 11, 2018 Ltr. from Puma to Weatherred, #8 Exhibit 8 - June 11, 2018 Ltr. from Puma to Gardner Denver, #9 Exhibit 9 - Gardner Denver Morgan Stanley Laguna Stmt., #10 Exhibit 10 - Gardner Denver Q3 2018 Earnings Call Transcript, #11 Exhibit 11 - Nov. 1, 2019 Ltr. from Blatt to Birmingham, #12 Exhibit 12 - Nov. 22, 2019 Ltr. from Birmingham to Blatt, #13 Exhibit 13 - Nov. 22, 2019 Ltr. from Birmingham to Blatt with Attachment, #14 Exhibit 14 - Dec. 8, 2019 Birmingham Email to Blatt with Attachment, #15 Exhibit 15 - Dec. 9, 2019 Blatt Email to Birmingham with Attachment, #16 Exhibit 16 - Dec. 12, 2019 Blatt-Birmingham Email Exchange, #17 Exhibit 17 - Gardner Denver May 2019 Investor Presentation, #18 Exhibit 18 - Danahers Instruments of Change, #19 Exhibit 19 -QDIP Examples, #20 Exhibit 20 - Reynal Proprietary Interest Agreement)This document and/or certain attachments are SEALED and only viewable by permission of the court(Hansen, Timothy)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Danaher Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Timothy)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Document Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Certain Supporting Documents by Danaher Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Timothy)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danaher Corporation. Gardner Denver Inc served on 12/10/2019. (Hansen, Timothy)
December 9, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Cecil B Wilson on behalf of Danaher Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: C. Bryan Wilson (Wilson, Cecil)
December 6, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Danaher Corporation. (Hansen, Timothy)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Gardner Denver Inc, Michael Weatherred by Danaher Corporation. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3299602) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansen, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danaher Corporation v. Gardner Denver Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver Inc
Represented By: Kate E Gehl
Represented By: Andrew J Wronski
Represented By: Ryan N Parsons
Represented By: John Birmingham, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Weatherred
Represented By: Kate E Gehl
Represented By: Andrew J Wronski
Represented By: Ryan N Parsons
Represented By: John Birmingham, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danaher Corporation
Represented By: Timothy M Hansen
Represented By: Thomas S Chapman
Represented By: Cecil B Wilson
Represented By: Dane H Butswinkas
Represented By: David S Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?