American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees Counsel 32 and its Affiliated Local 467 AFL-CIO v. Sunny Ridge Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC et al
Plaintiff: American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees Counsel 32 and its Affiliated Local 467 AFL-CIO
Defendant: Sunny Ridge Rehabilitation Center LLC, Sunny Ridge Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC, Prestige Healthcare Group LLC and Monarch Healthcare Operating III LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01811
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William E McCardell on behalf of Monarch Healthcare Operating III LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: William E. McCardell (McCardell, William)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees Counsel 32 and its Affiliated Local 467 AFL-CIO. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Sweet, Mark)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees Counsel 32 and its Affiliated Local 467 AFL-CIO. (Sweet, Mark)
December 11, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
December 11, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monarch Healthcare Operating III LLC, Prestige Healthcare Group LLC, Sunny Ridge Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC, Sunny Ridge Rehabilitation Center LLC by AFSCME Council 32 and its affiliated Local 467. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3302694) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Sweet, Mark) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/11/2019) (lz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees Counsel 32 and its Affiliated Local 467 AFL-CIO v. Sunny Ridge Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees Counsel 32 and its Affiliated Local 467 AFL-CIO
Represented By: Mark A Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunny Ridge Rehabilitation Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunny Ridge Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Healthcare Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monarch Healthcare Operating III LLC
Represented By: William E McCardell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?