Alvarado v. Demers et al
Plaintiff: Ramon Alvarado, Jr
Defendant: Property Officer Schmidt, Jane/John Doe, James Muenchow, Kyle Demers, Brian Foster and Officer Heine
Case Number: 2:2019cv01848
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ramon Alvarado, Jr. (tlf)
January 13, 2020 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $.19, receipt number MK4689-081102. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from the Clerk to Ramon Alvarado, Jr regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/23/19 that the plaintiff is assessed $0.19 as an initial partial payment of the $350.00 fee for filing this case. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, warden, financial)(jad)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Mailed to plaintiff. (cmb)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ramon Alvarado, Jr. (cmb)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Ramon Alvarado, Jr. (cmb)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with jury demand filed against All Defendants by Ramon Alvarado, Jr. (cmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarado v. Demers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property Officer Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Muenchow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Demers
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Heine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Alvarado, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?