Jungbluth v. Lloyd
Plaintiff: William J Jungbluth
Defendant: United States, North Shore Bank FSB and Denis J Lloyd
Case Number: 2:2020cv00005
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 2/24/2020: ADOPTING #21 Magistrate Judge William E Duffin's Report and Recommendation; GRANTING #9 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court; REMANDING CASE to Waukesha County Circuit Court; and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to take all necessary steps to effectuate the remand. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
February 12, 2020 Filing 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court be granted signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 2/12/2020. Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (cc: all counsel)(kah)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 2/12/2020. North Shore Bank FSB was dismissed with prejudice and without costs on February 5, 2020. Accordingly, the court dismisses as moot North Shore Bank FSB's motion to dismiss (ECF No. #12 ). (cc: all counsel) (kah)
February 5, 2020 Party North Shore Bank FSB dismissed with prejudice and without costs pursuant to Stipulation for Dismissal #17 . (mlm)
February 5, 2020 Filing 19 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by William J Jungbluth. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Fay, Erin)
February 5, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by North Shore Bank FSB (Davenport, Andrea)
February 5, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal by North Shore Bank FSB. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davenport, Andrea)
January 31, 2020 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to Plaintiff William J Jungbluth requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 14 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (mlm)
January 27, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by North Shore Bank FSB (Davenport, Andrea)
January 27, 2020 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE Statement by North Shore Bank FSB. (Davenport, Andrea)
January 27, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Andrea M. Davenport in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Davenport, Andrea)
January 27, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support filed by North Shore Bank FSB re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) . (Davenport, Andrea)
January 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by North Shore Bank FSB. (Davenport, Andrea)
January 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David G Peterson on behalf of North Shore Bank FSB. Attorney(s) appearing: David G. Peterson (Peterson, David)
January 24, 2020 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by North Shore Bank FSB. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Davenport, Andrea)
January 17, 2020 Party The United States of America dismissed on the merits, with prejudice, and without costs to either party pursuant to Stipulation for Dismissal #8 . (lz)
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by William J Jungbluth. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Remand to State Court)(Fay, Erin)
January 17, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal of United States of America by William J Jungbluth. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Dismiss USA)(Fay, Erin)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The court finding good cause, the United States' motion for an enlargement of time to respond to the complaint (ECF No. #2 ) is granted. The United States shall have until March 3, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Additionally, based on the stipulation of the parties (ECF No. #5 ) and the court finding good cause, Defendant North Shore Bank, FSB shall have until January 27, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 1/10/2020. (cc: all counsel) (mlm)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by North Shore Bank FSB (Davenport, Andrea)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by North Shore Bank FSB. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davenport, Andrea) Modified on 1/10/2020 (mlm).
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea M Davenport on behalf of North Shore Bank FSB. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrea M. Davenport (Davenport, Andrea)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 ATTACHMENTS Wisconsin Circuit Court Documents by United States re #1 Notice of Removal. (Suenram, Christopher)
January 3, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (cmb)
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Enlarge Time to Answer or Move by United States. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Suenram, Christopher)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States from Waukesha County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2019SC005688 with attached state court documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Suenram, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jungbluth v. Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J Jungbluth
Represented By: Erin K Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Christopher F Suenram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Shore Bank FSB
Represented By: David G Peterson
Represented By: Andrea M Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis J Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?