Pease v. Whitewater Unified School District et al
Plaintiff: James Pease
Defendant: Mark Elworthy and Whitewater Unified School District
Case Number: 2:2020cv00103
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants.(Stephens, Elizabeth)
February 24, 2020 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (asc)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Whitewater Unified School District - Waiver sent on 1/23/2020. (Hitchcock Cross, Ben)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mark Elworthy - Waiver sent on 1/23/2020. (Hitchcock Cross, Ben)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by James Pease. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Flanner, Mary)
February 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth C Stephens on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Elizabeth C. Stephens (Stephens, Elizabeth)
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Mark Elworthy, Whitewater Unified School District. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Lubinsky, Lori)
February 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori M Lubinsky on behalf of Mark Elworthy, Whitewater Unified School District. Attorney(s) appearing: Atty. Lori M. Lubinsky (Lubinsky, Lori)
January 22, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (cmb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by James Pease. (Hitchcock Cross, Ben)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Mark Elworthy, Whitewater Unified School District by James Pease. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3339354) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signed Contract and Offer, #2 Exhibit B - WUSD news article - Pease out as athletic director, #3 Exhibit C - Pease Resignation Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hitchcock Cross, Ben)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pease v. Whitewater Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Pease
Represented By: Ben Hitchcock Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Elworthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitewater Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?