Spencer v. Vein Clinics of America Inc
Plaintiff: Tracy Spencer
Defendant: Vein Clinics of America Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00111
Filed: January 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Tracy Spencer. (Olson, Alan)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/26/20. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on April 9, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Vein Clinics of America Inc.(Nuedling, Brian)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Vein Clinics of America Inc. (Nuedling, Brian)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Vein Clinics of America Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Nuedling, Brian)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Tracy Spencer. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Olson, Alan)
January 27, 2020 Summons Issued as to Vein Clinics of America Inc. (jcl)
January 27, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
January 25, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Tracy Spencer (Olson, Alan)
January 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Vein Clinics of America Inc by Tracy Spencer. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3341706) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Olson, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Vein Clinics of America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vein Clinics of America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Spencer
Represented By: Alan C Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?