Ahmad Properties LLC v. Hamdan et al
Plaintiff: Ahmad Properties, LLC and Ahmad Properties LLC
Defendant: New York Pizza Delivery (NYPD) LLC, New York Pizza Deliver II (NYPD) LLC and Abel Hamdan
Case Number: 2:2020cv00177
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Case Terminated pursuant to #8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. NOTE: Court order is not required under Fed. R. Civil P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (ds)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 3/3/2020: ADOPTING #8 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and DISMISSING CASE without prejudice and without costs. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
March 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ahmad Properties LLC. (Wong, Sarah)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 ADMISSION OF SERVICE of New York Pizza Delivery II (NYPD), LLC: Summons served on 2/19/2020 by Abel Hamdan (Wong, Sarah) Modified on 2/25/2020 (asc).
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 ADMISSION OF SERVICE of New York Pizza Delivery (NYPD), LLC: Summons served on 2/19/2020 by Abel Hamdan (Wong, Sarah) Modified on 2/25/2020 (asc).
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summon and Complaint: Summons served on 2/19/2020 by Abel Hamdan (Wong, Sarah) Modified on 2/25/2020 (asc).
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (asc)
February 6, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Griggs on behalf of Ahmad Properties, LLC. (Griggs, Michael)
February 5, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Ahmad Properties, LLC. (Wong, Sarah)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Abel Hamdan, New York Pizza Deliver II (NYPD) LLC, New York Pizza Delivery (NYPD) LLC by Ahmad Properties, LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3353557) (Attachments: #1 Summons Abel Hamdan, #2 Summons New York Pizza Delivery (NYPD) LLC, #3 Summons New York Pizza Delivery II (NYPD) LLC, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wong, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmad Properties LLC v. Hamdan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmad Properties, LLC
Represented By: Sarah M Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmad Properties LLC
Represented By: Sarah M Wong
Represented By: Michael T Griggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Pizza Delivery (NYPD) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Pizza Deliver II (NYPD) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abel Hamdan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?