Kapp v. Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Kapp
Defendant: Culligan Soft Water Service, Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co, Unco Data Systems Inc and Culligan International Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00286
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 5/8/2020 GRANTING #106 Defendants' Motion to Stay. All proceedings in this matter are stayed until the Supreme Court issues its decision in Barr v. American Association of Political Consultants, Case No. 19-631. Following the Court's decision in Barr (and depending on the circumstances in light of the current pandemic) the court will hold a telephonic conference to discuss further scheduling. (cc: all counsel) (lz)
April 30, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE by Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co, Unco Data Systems Inc of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unpublished Cases)(Johnson, Alyssa)
April 28, 2020 Filing 108 APPENDIX by Aaron Kapp Index of Unpublished Cases. (Lewis, Tod)
April 28, 2020 Filing 107 RESPONSE filed by Aaron Kapp Plaintiff's response to #106 Defendants' civil L.R. 7(h) mtn to stay proceeding (Lewis, Tod) Modified on 4/29/2020 (lz).
April 21, 2020 Filing 106 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Stay Proceeding Pending Supreme Court's Decision in Barr v. Amer. Assoc. by Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co, Unco Data Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Unpublished Cases)(Johnson, Alyssa)
April 21, 2020 Filing 105 ANSWER to #104 Amended Complaint Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co, Unco Data Systems Inc.(Johnson, Alyssa)
April 7, 2020 Filing 104 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Second Amended Class Action Complaint with Jury Demand against Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co, Unco Data Systems Inc filed by Aaron Kapp.(Bock, Phillip) Modified on 4/8/2020 (lz).
April 7, 2020 Filing 103 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/7/2020. Second amended complaint to be filed today via stipulation. Answer to be filed 4/21/2020. Motion to stay pending a Supreme Court case may also be filed if counsel elects to. (Tape #ATT Conf 9:30 - 9:36 am) (lz)
March 27, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/7/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. Participants shall call the courts conference line at 888-278-0296 and use access code 8322317# to join the call. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
March 26, 2020 Filing 102 DISCLOSURE Statement by Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co. (Johnson, Alyssa)
March 26, 2020 Filing 101 DISCLOSURE Statement by Unco Data Systems Inc. (Johnson, Alyssa)
March 23, 2020 SECOND NOTICE to DEFENDANTS - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (lz)
March 10, 2020 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: 3/13/2020 scheduling conference is canceled and the 3/10/2020 deadline to file a joint Rule 26 Plan is canceled. (cc: all counsel) (lz)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 3/10/2020. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin for all further proceedings. Judge J P Stadtmueller no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
March 9, 2020 Filing 99 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Aaron Kapp. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) This document and/or certain attachments are SEALED and only viewable by permission of the court(Oppenheim, David)
March 6, 2020 Filing 98 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co, Unco Data Systems Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Johnson, Alyssa)
February 27, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa A Johnson on behalf of Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co, Unco Data Systems Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Alyssa A. Johnson (Johnson, Alyssa)
February 25, 2020 Filing 96 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 3/13/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 3/10/2020. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
February 21, 2020 Filing 95 NOTICE of Withdrawal MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Culligan Soft Water Service, Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co, Unco Data Systems Inc. (Stein, Brandon) Modified on 2/25/2020 (asc).
February 21, 2020 Filing 94 LETTER to John Letchinger regarding Admission and ECF registration (sent via USPS) (jcl)
February 21, 2020 Filing 93 LETTER to Adam E Urbanczyk, Ilan Chorowsky and Mark Anthony Bulgarelli regarding Admission and ECF registration. (sent via USPS) (jcl)
February 21, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
February 21, 2020 Filing 92 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00355. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 20, 2020 Filing 91 TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Wisconsin the electronic record. (aee, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 90 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on November 4, 2019 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Order Number: 36644. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 2/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2020. (Cox, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 89 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on June 26, 2019 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 2/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2020. (Cox, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 88 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on May 23, 2019 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Order Number: 34839. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 2/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2020. (Cox, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 87 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on May 8, 2019 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 2/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2020. (Cox, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on June 6, 2019 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 2/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2020. (Cox, Carolyn) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Filing 85 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, plaintiff's claims against defendants Culligan International Co. and Culligan Soft Water Service Co. are dismissed without prejudice. Also pursuant to stipulation, the Clerk is directed to transfer the remainder of the case, specifically plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants, Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co. and Unco Data Systems, Inc., to the Eastern District of Wisconsin pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a). The status hearing set for 1/9/2020 is vacated. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (mma, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 84 STIPULATION regarding order on motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction,,,, ruling on motion hearing,,,, set/reset hearings,,, #75 to transfer action to the Eastern District of Wisconsin (Oppenheim, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 83 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Culligan International Company and Culligan Soft Water Service Co. (Oppenheim, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
December 17, 2019 Filing 82 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The parties' motion to continue the 12/19/2019 status hearing #80 is granted in part. The status hearing is reset to 1/9/2020 at 9:30 AM. This will be an in-person status hearing. The Court declines to set a later date as requested. The Court will not be available on 1/16/2020, and more importantly the parties have had plenty of time since 11/4/2019 to negotiate and conclude an appropriate agreement. The Court will not entertain further requests to continue the hearing. If the parties have not concluded an agreement by that time, the Court will make a ruling on that date regarding whether and where to transfer the case. (mk) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew J Caccamo for presentment of motion to continue #80 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/19/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Caccamo, Matthew) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION by Defendant Culligan International Company to continue Joint Unopposed Motion to Continue Status Hearing (Caccamo, Matthew) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 79 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion to withdraw the appearance of attorney Mara Ann Baltabols is granted. (mk) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 78 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held on 11/18/2019 and continued to 12/19/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (mma, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Motion by Mara Ann Baltabols for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #76 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/20/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Baltabols, Mara) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION by Attorney Mara A. Baltabols to withdraw as attorney for Aaron Kapp. No party information provided (Baltabols, Mara) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 75 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Ruling on a motion hearing held on 11/4/2019. Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, improper venue, or in the alternative, to transfer venue #35 is granted in part. The Court finds that personal jurisdiction is lacking over plaintiff's claims against defendants Culligan Soft Water Service Co., Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co., and Unco Data Systems. The court takes under advisement the request to transfer venue rather than to dismiss these defendants. Parties are directed to discuss the options, including an appropriate venue to which to transfer the case, before the next hearing. Status hearing is set for 11/18/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (mma, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
November 3, 2019 Filing 74 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court advises that it has questions regarding certain matters pertaining to the pending motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (etc.), intends to ask those questions at tomorrow's status hearing, and may or may not rule on the motion to dismiss tomorrow. (mk) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 73 REPLY by Culligan Soft Water Service Co., Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co., Unco Data Systems, Inc. to memorandum in support of motion, #36 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Schultz, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 72 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an 18-page response brief #70 and his motion for leave to file exhibit A under seal #68 are both granted. The required chambers copy of the reply brief must include all of the exhibits as part of the same bound document. (mk) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Motion by David Max Oppenheim for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #70 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/8/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Oppenheim, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION by Plaintiff Aaron Kapp to Increase Page Limit (Oppenheim, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Motion by David Max Oppenheim for presentment of motion to seal document #68 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/8/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Oppenheim, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION by Plaintiff Aaron Kapp to seal document response in opposition to motion, #66 (Oppenheim, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 67 SEALED RESPONSE by Aaron Kapp to MOTION by Defendant Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , Improper Venue #35 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Oppenheim, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 66 RESPONSE by Aaron Kappin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , Improper Venue #35 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Oppenheim, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 65 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time #63 is granted. Due date for response to motion to dismiss is extended to 9/30/2019. Due date for reply to response is extended to 10/21/2019. (mk) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Motion by Mara Ann Baltabols for presentment of motion for extension of time #63 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/19/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Baltabols, Mara) Modified on 9/16/2019 (pjg, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION by Plaintiff Aaron Kapp for extension of time (Baltabols, Mara) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 62 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The entry dated 8/12/2019 (dkt. no. 61) contained a scrivener's error and is corrected to read as follows. Telephone status hearing held with attorneys for all parties. The Court concludes that no deposition of Mr. Packard is appropriate at this time. If further affidavits are filed with defendants' reply brief, plaintiff will be permitted to depose the affiants. Response to the motion to dismiss #35 is to be filed by 9/20/2019; reply is due by 10/11/2019. Ruling on motion is set for 11/4/2019 at 9:30 a.m. (mk) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 61 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephone status hearing held with attorneys for all parties. The Court concludes that no deposition of Mr. Packard is appropriate at this time. If further affidavits are filed with defendants' reply brief, plaintiff will be permitted to depose the affidavits. Response to the motion to dismiss #35 is to be filed by 9/20/2019; reply is due by 10/11/2019. Ruling on motion is set for 11/4/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 60 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the parties' request, the 8/12/2019 status hearing is converted to a telephone status hearing, to be initiated by the parties and the time is advanced to 9:15 a.m. Once all parties are on the phone, they are to jointly contact chambers at (312) 435-5618 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 59 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held on 6/26/2019. Deadline for 30(b)(6) deposition of Culligan International is 7/24/2019. Status hearing set for 8/12/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 58 STATUS Report Regarding Plaintiff's Requests for the Production of Documents by Aaron Kapp (Oppenheim, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 57 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/18/2019: Defendants' unopposed motion for entry of agreed confidentiality order is granted. (mk) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Motion by Brandon S. Stein for presentment of motion for protective order #55 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/18/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Stein, Brandon) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION by Defendants Culligan Soft Water Service Co., Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co., Unco Data Systems, Inc. for protective order (UNOPPOSED - AGREED) (Stein, Brandon) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE by John Sheldon Letchinger of Change of Address (Letchinger, John) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE by Matthew J Caccamo of Change of Address (Caccamo, Matthew) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 52 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held on 6/6/2019. Defendants have until 6/20/2019 to provide discovery. Joint status report to be filed by 6/24/2019. Status hearing set for 6/26/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 51 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion to extend time for service is withdrawn; status hearing remains set for 6/6/2019 at 9:30 AM. (mk) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 50 STATUS Report Regarding Plaintiff's Requests for the Production of Documents by Aaron Kapp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's Document Requests)(Oppenheim, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Kapp as to Unco Data Systems, Inc. on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Baltabols, Mara) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Culligan Soft Water Service Co. , SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Kapp as to Culligan Soft Water Service Co. on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Baltabols, Mara) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Kapp as to Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co. on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Baltabols, Mara) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Motion by Mara Ann Baltabols for presentment of before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/6/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Baltabols, Mara) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION by Plaintiff Aaron Kapp to Withdraw Motion to Extend Time for Service (Baltabols, Mara) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Motion by Mara Ann Baltabols for presentment of extension of time #43 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/6/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Baltabols, Mara) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION by Plaintiff Aaron Kapp for extension of time for service (Baltabols, Mara) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing and motion hearing held on 5/23/2019. Documents requests are to be served by 5/24/2019; objections are due by 5/31/2019. Joint status report regarding discovery issues as stated in open court to be filed by 6/4/2019. Status hearing is set for 6/6/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 41 STATUS Report regarding jurisdictional discovery by Aaron Kapp (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Hearing Transcript)(Baltabols, Mara) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendants Culligan Soft Water, Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning, and Unco Data's request to continue status and motion hearing is granted without objection. Motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #35 and status hearing reset to 5/23/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Hearing date of 5/21/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (mw, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
May 9, 2019 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendants Culligan Soft Water Service Co., Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co., Unco Data Systems, Inc.. (mc, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 39 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing and motion hearing held on 5/8/2019. Motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #35 and status hearing continued to 5/21/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Joint status report regarding discovery on personal jurisdiction issue as stated in open court to be filed by 5/17/2019. The Clerk is directed to issue alias summons. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
May 5, 2019 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, the status hearing set for 5/8/2019 at 9:00 AM is moved to 9:30 AM on that date. (mk) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Motion by David M Schultz for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #35 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/8/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Schultz, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM by Culligan Soft Water Service Co., Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co., Unco Data Systems, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #35 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration)(Schultz, David) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 5/1/2019) (sxb, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION by Defendants Culligan Soft Water Service Co., Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co., Unco Data Systems, Inc. to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, improper venue, or in the alternative, to transfer venue. (Schultz, David) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 5/1/2019 (jjr, )(sxb, ). [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At plaintiff's request, by agreement with the defendants, the 5/2/2019 status hearing is vacated and reset for 5/8/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendants' motion for enlargement of time is granted; response to amended complaint is to be filed by 5/1/2019. Defendants' should not expect a further extension. The status hearing set for 4/18/2019 is vacated and reset to 5/2/2019 at 9:00 AM. (mk) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Culligan Soft Water Service Co., Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co., Unco Data Systems, Inc. by John Paul Ryan (Ryan, John) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Culligan International Company, Culligan Soft Water Service Co., Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co., Unco Data Systems, Inc. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion by Brandon S. Stein for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #29 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/10/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Stein, Brandon) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION by Defendants Culligan Soft Water Service Co., Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co., Unco Data Systems, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #18 (Stein, Brandon) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Culligan Soft Water Service Co., Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co., Unco Data Systems, Inc. by Brandon S. Stein (Stein, Brandon) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Aaron Kapp by Adam E. Urbanczyk (Urbanczyk, Adam) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Kapp as to Unco Data Systems, Inc. on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. (Baltabols, Mara) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Kapp as to Culligan Soft Water Service Co. on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. (Baltabols, Mara) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Kapp as to Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co. on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. (Baltabols, Mara) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Rule 16(b) status hearing held on 3/20/2019. Status hearing is continued to 4/18/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to amended complaint by Culligan International Company(Caccamo, Matthew) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
March 18, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Culligan Soft Water Service Co., Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co., Unco Data Systems, Inc. (pk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
March 17, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the complaint and add defendants and to deem his amended complaint timely filed #19 is granted, but the latter aspect of this order is conditioned upon plaintiff serving the new defendants with summons, not a waiver. The Clerk is directed to add Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co., Culligan Soft Water Service Co., and Unco Data Systems, Inc. as defendants and is directed to issue summons to those defendants. The case remains set for a status hearing on 3/20/2019 as previously ordered. (mk) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Phillip A. Bock for presentment of motion to amend/correct #19 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/20/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Bock, Phillip) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff Aaron Kapp to amend/correct amended complaint #18 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bock, Phillip) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED complaint by Aaron Kapp against Culligan International Company (Bock, Phillip) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At plaintiff's request, and by agreement of the parties, the 3/13/2019 status hearing is vacated and reset for 3/20/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Culligan International Company(Caccamo, Matthew) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 3/13/2019 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. (mk) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time #12 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 2/14/2019. (mk) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's NOTICE of Motion by Matthew J Caccamo for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #12 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/5/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Caccamo, Matthew) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Culligan International Company for extension of time to file answer (Caccamo, Matthew) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 21, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Aaron Kapp by Mark Anthony Bulgarelli (Bulgarelli, Mark) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 21, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Aaron Kapp by Mara Ann Baltabols (Baltabols, Mara) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 21, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Aaron Kapp by David Max Oppenheim (Oppenheim, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 21, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Aaron Kapp by Tod Allen Lewis (Lewis, Tod) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 21, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Aaron Kapp by Phillip A. Bock (Bock, Phillip) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Aaron Kapp by Ilan Chorowsky (Chorowsky, Ilan) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to all counsel of record. (smm, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 17, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Letchinger, John) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Culligan International Company by John Sheldon Letchinger (Letchinger, John) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Culligan International Company by Matthew J Caccamo (Caccamo, Matthew) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2018-CH-15540) filed by Culligan International Company Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15389448. (Caccamo, Matthew) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kapp v. Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Culligan Soft Water Service
Represented By: John P Ryan
Represented By: David M Schultz
Represented By: Brandon S Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Wisconsin Water Conditioning Co
Represented By: John P Ryan
Represented By: David M Schultz
Represented By: Brandon S Stein
Represented By: Alyssa A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unco Data Systems Inc
Represented By: John P Ryan
Represented By: David M Schultz
Represented By: Brandon S Stein
Represented By: Alyssa A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Culligan International Company
Represented By: Matthew J Caccamo
Represented By: John Sheldon Letchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Kapp
Represented By: Tod A Lewis
Represented By: Mark Anthony Bulgarelli
Represented By: Adam E Urbanczyk
Represented By: Phillip A Bock
Represented By: Mara A Baltabols
Represented By: David M Oppenheim
Represented By: Ilan Chorowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?