Walberts v. Abele et al
Plaintiff: Joseph J Walberts
Defendant: Chris Abele, Catrina Samanko and Kevin Carr
Case Number: 2:2020cv00321
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (Mailed NEF to plaintiff) (asc)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Joseph J Walberts. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)
March 10, 2020 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $8.17, receipt number MK4689-081879. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address as to Joseph J Walberts. NEW ADDRESS: THOMPSON CORRECTIONAL CENTER, 434 STATE FARM ROAD, DEERFIELD, WI 53531 (Attachments: #1 INCOMPLETE Consent to Magistrate Form)(ds) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/10/2020: #2 Letter re Magistrate Consent/Refusal form) (ds).
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before 3/23/2020 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 8.17 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, warden)(asc)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (asc)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Joseph J Walberts. (asc)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Joseph J Walberts. (asc)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Joseph J Walberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(asc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walberts v. Abele et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Abele
Represented By: Milwaukee County - 550, 555
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catrina Samanko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph J Walberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?