Zutz v. Froedtert Health
Plaintiff: Kerise Zutz
Defendant: Froedtert Health
Case Number: 2:2020cv00388
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Froedtert Health. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Hayes, Devin)
April 10, 2020 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Froedtert Health.(Brosnan, Doris)
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Doris E Brosnan on behalf of Froedtert Health. Attorney(s) appearing: Doris E. Brosnan (Brosnan, Doris)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Doris E Brosnan on behalf of Froedtert Health. Attorney(s) appearing: Devin S. Hayes (Brosnan, Doris)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kerise Zutz. Froedtert Health served on 3/19/2020. (Hartley, Jill)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kerise Zutz. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Hartley, Jill)
March 12, 2020 Summons Issued as to Froedtert Health. (asc)
March 11, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Kerise Zutz. (Hartley, Jill)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kerise Zutz ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3390474) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hartley, Jill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zutz v. Froedtert Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerise Zutz
Represented By: Jill M Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Froedtert Health
Represented By: Doris E Brosnan
Represented By: Devin S Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?