Jackson v. Guzman et al
Case Number: 2:2020cv00475
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCREENING ORDER signed by Judge Brett Ludwig on 2/17/21. Pursuant to an informal service agreement between the Wisconsin Department of Justice and this Court, copies of the amended complaint and this order are being electronically sent today to the W isconsin Department of Justice for service on Guzman and Sabel. Guzman and Sabel shall file a responsive pleading to the amended complaint within sixty days of receiving electronic notice of this order. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party) (MP)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/29/2020. Clerk of Court to REOPEN case. 2 Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee GRANTED; agency having custody of plaintiff to collect $346.25 balance of fili ng fee from plaintiff's prison trust account under 28 USC §1915(b)(2). Plaintiff's complaint fails to state claim; plaintiff may file amended complaint by 12/4/2020, failure to file by deadline will result in dismissal, strike. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Warden and Nugene Jackson (with blank complaint form and "Answers to Prisoner Litigants' Common Questions") at Racine Correctional Institution)(cb)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/23/2020. Case DISMISSED without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to pay initial partial filing fee. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Nugene Jackson at Racine Correctional Institution)(cb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Guzman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?