Jaeger et al v. Meijer Stores Limited Partnership
Plaintiff: Joanna Jaeger, UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin, Inc. and UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc
Defendant: Meijer Stores Limited Partnership
Case Number: 2:2020cv00565
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Crossclaim filed by Joanna Jaeger. (Ryan, Michael)
April 30, 2020 Filing 12 Defendant Meijer Stores Limited Partnership's ANSWER to Counterclaim and Cross-Claim from Subrogated Plaintiff UnitedHealthCare of Wisconsin, Inc. filed by Meijer Stores Limited Partnership. (Andrews, Eric)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 4/22/2020 DENYING without prejudice #6 Parties' Joint Motion for Stipulated Protective Order. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
April 18, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc. (Mayer, Matthew)
April 18, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Mayer, Matthew)
April 18, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint AND CROSSCLAIM against Plaintiff filed by UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc. (Mayer, Matthew)
April 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S Mayer on behalf of UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew S. Mayer (Mayer, Matthew)
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Meijer Stores Limited Partnership. (Andrews, Eric)
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Meijer Stores Limited Partnership. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Andrews, Eric)
April 14, 2020 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant Meijer Stores Limited Partnership's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Meijer Stores Limited Partnership.(Andrews, Eric)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Joanna Jaeger. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Ryan, Michael)
April 7, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Meijer Stores Limited Partnership. (Andrews, Eric)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Meijer Stores Limited Partnership from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2020CV002206 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3414826) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaeger et al v. Meijer Stores Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Jaeger
Represented By: Michael John Ryan
Represented By: Michael S Sperling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc
Represented By: Matthew S Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meijer Stores Limited Partnership
Represented By: Eric L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?