Quezada-Navarro v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Miguel David Quezada-Navarro
Respondent: USCIS Milwaukee Field Office, William P Barr, Kay F Leopold and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 2:2020cv00610
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 15 Declaration Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by Miguel David Quezada-Navarro served upon Respondents' Counsel on 05/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Muwonge, Godfrey) Modified on 6/12/2020 (ds).
June 8, 2020 Filing 14 DUPLICATE OF #2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Miguel David Quezada-Navarro. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Muwonge, Godfrey) Modified on 6/8/2020 (ds).
June 4, 2020 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by William P Barr, Kay F Leopold, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Warwick, Lisa)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 5/29/2020. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Judge J P Stadtmueller no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
May 27, 2020 Filing 11 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against William P Barr, Kay F Leopold, USCIS Milwaukee Field Office filed by Miguel David Quezada-Navarro.(Muwonge, Godfrey) Modified on 6/2/2020 (ds).
May 27, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Petitioner's Amendment of Petition by Miguel David Quezada-Navarro. (Muwonge, Godfrey)
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kay F Leopold, USCIS Milwaukee Field Office, William P Barr. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Warwick, Lisa) Modified filers pursuant to AUSA on 6/1/2020 (blr).
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa T Warwick on behalf of William P Barr, Kay F Leopold, USCIS Milwaukee Field Office. Attorney(s) appearing: AUSA Lisa T. Warwick (Warwick, Lisa)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miguel David Quezada-Navarro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Muwonge, Godfrey)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miguel David Quezada-Navarro. Kay F Leopold served on 5/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Muwonge, Godfrey)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miguel David Quezada-Navarro. William P Barr served on 5/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Muwonge, Godfrey)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against William P Barr filed by Miguel David Quezada-Navarro.(Muwonge, Godfrey)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason T Cleereman on behalf of Miguel David Quezada-Navarro. Attorney(s) appearing: Jason T Cleereman (Cleereman, Jason)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Miguel David Quezada-Navarro. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Muwonge, Godfrey)
April 16, 2020 Summons Issued as to William P Barr, Kay F Leopold, USCIS Milwaukee Field Office. (asc)
April 16, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION filed by MIGUEL DAVID QUEZADA-NAVARRO. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3424295) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Muwonge, Godfrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quezada-Navarro v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USCIS Milwaukee Field Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kay F Leopold
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miguel David Quezada-Navarro
Represented By: Godfrey Y Muwonge
Represented By: Jason T Cleereman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?