Abdullah et al v. Inspire Brands Inc et al
Plaintiff: United Healthcare Insurance Company and Najjar H Abdullah, Jr
Defendant: Meress & Associates LLC, ABC Insurance Company, Inspire Brands Inc and DEF Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00612
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party by Inspire Brands Inc. (Attachments: #1 Blazin Wings, Inc.'s Answer and Statement of Defenses, #2 Defendant Blazin Wings, Inc.'s Answer and Statement of Defenses to Counterclaim and Cross-claim of Involuntary Plaintiff United Healthcare Insurance Company, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Dill, Jesse)
June 12, 2020 Filing 18 DISREGARD; Filed in Error Defendant Blazin Wing's ANSWER to Complaint and Statement of Defenses by Inspire Brands Inc.(Dill, Jesse) Modified on 6/12/2020 (bx).
June 12, 2020 Filing 17 DISREGARD; Filed in Error Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party by Inspire Brands Inc. (Dill, Jesse) Modified on 6/12/2020 (bx).
May 26, 2020 Filing 16 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Najjar H Abdullah, Jr. (Sulton, William)
May 8, 2020 Filing 15 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Crossclaim of Involuntary Plaintiff filed by Najjar H Abdullah, Jr. (Sulton, William)
May 5, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Counterclaim and Cross-Claim of Involuntary Plaintiff United HealthCare Insurance Company filed by Inspire Brands Inc. (Dill, Jesse)
May 4, 2020 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Meress & Associates LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Riordan, Christopher)
May 4, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE Statement by Meress & Associates LLC. (Riordan, Christopher)
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Involuntary Plaintiff (filed as #13 in Milwaukee County Case No. 2020CV001986) filed by Meress & Associates LLC., ANSWER to Crossclaim of Involuntary Plaintiff (filed as #13 in Milwaukee County Case No. 2020CV001986) filed by Meress & Associates LLC. (Riordan, Christopher)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/4/20. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on June 16, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Meress & Associates LLC.(Riordan, Christopher)
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P Riordan on behalf of Meress & Associates LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Christopher P. Riordan (Riordan, Christopher)
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Najjar H Abdullah, Jr. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Sulton, William)
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Najjar H Abdullah, Jr. (Sulton, William)
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina L Wabiszewski on behalf of Inspire Brands Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Christina L. Wabiszewski (Wabiszewski, Christina)
April 15, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse R Dill on behalf of Inspire Brands Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Jesse R. Dill (Dill, Jesse)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Statement of Defenses filed by Inspire Brands Inc. (Dill, Jesse)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Inspire Brands Inc. (Dill, Jesse)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Inspire Brands Inc from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2020CV001986 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3423893) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dill, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdullah et al v. Inspire Brands Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Najjar H Abdullah, Jr
Represented By: William F Sulton
Represented By: Mark L Thomsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meress & Associates LLC
Represented By: Christopher P Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inspire Brands Inc
Represented By: Jesse R Dill
Represented By: Christina L Wabiszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?