Earls v. Fuchs et al
Petitioner: Fairly W Earls
Respondent: Larry Fuchs
Case Number: 2:2020cv00635
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 FILING FEE Received: $5.00, receipt number MK4689-082566. (jcl)
April 28, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Fairly W Earls. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lh)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Fairly Earls regarding Consent/Refusal Form (Form was mailed to Fairly Earls on 4/22/2020). (mac)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER from the clerk to Fairly Earls re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting payment of the full filing fee or that a petition to proceed without prepayment of the full filing fee and six-month certified trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (cav)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION CORAM NOBIS filed by Fairly W Earls. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(cav)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Earls v. Fuchs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fairly W Earls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larry Fuchs
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?