Stein v. Town N Country Title LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Stein and Pamela Kahn-Stein
Defendant: Nancy McHugh, Town N' Country Title and Town N Country Title LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00675
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Town N Country Title LLC - Waiver sent on 5/19/2020. (Cade, Nathaniel)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nancy McHugh - Waiver sent on 5/19/2020. (Cade, Nathaniel)
May 4, 2020 Summons Issued as to Nancy McHugh. (vkb)
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Pamela Stein (Cade, Nathaniel)
May 1, 2020 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc)
May 1, 2020 Summons Issued as to Town N Country Title LLC. (asc)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Pamela Stein. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Cade, Nathaniel)
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Pamela Stein (Cade, Nathaniel)
May 1, 2020 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (asc)
April 30, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Nacny McHugh, Town N' Country Title by pamela stein. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3438600) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit 2- Right to Sue Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cade, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stein v. Town N Country Title LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town N' Country Title
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town N Country Title LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Stein
Represented By: Nathaniel Cade, Jr
Represented By: Carlos R Pastrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Kahn-Stein
Represented By: Nathaniel Cade, Jr
Represented By: Carlos R Pastrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?