Ambrosia Indy LLC v. Society Insurance A Mutual Company
Plaintiff: Ambrosia Indy LLC d/b/a Ambrosia Restaurant
Defendant: Society Insurance, A Mutual Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00771
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF RECUSAL signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 7/14/2020. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper recused. Case reassigned to Judge J. P. Stadtmueller for all further proceedings. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
July 10, 2020 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)
July 9, 2020 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Society Insurance A Mutual Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Cain, Janet)
July 7, 2020 NOTICE from the clerk to ALL PARTIES requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin for all further proceedings. (cc: all counsel)(asc)
July 6, 2020 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 APPENDIX by Society Insurance A Mutual Company in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1.Indiana Executive Order No. 20-02, #2 Exhibit 2.Indiana Executive Order No. 20-04, #3 Exhibit 3.Indiana Executive Order No. 20-08, #4 Exhibit 4.Indiana Executive Order No. 20-26, #5 Exhibit 5.Society Insurance Businessowners Policy of Insurance No. BP18044498-1 issued to Ambrosia Indy Inc. d/b/a Ambrosia Restaurant, effective 01/24/20 to 01/24/21, #6 Exhibit 6.ERA Franchise Sys., LLC v. Hoppens Realty, Inc., No. 12-CV-594-SLC, 2013 WL 3967869 (W.D. Wis. July 31, 2013), #7 Exhibit 7.3303-05 Marina Road LLC v West Bend Mutual Insurance Company, 2009AP1629, 2010 WL 3489391 (Wis. Ct. App. Sep. 8, 2010), #8 Exhibit 8.General Cas. Co. of Wisconsin v. Rainbow Insulators, Inc., 2010AP347 2011 WL 1162088 (Wis. Ct. App. March 31, 2011), #9 Exhibit 9.Universal Image Prods., Inc. v. Fed. Ins. Co., 475 Fed. Appx. 569 (6th Cir. 2012), #10 Exhibit 10.Columbiaknit, Inc. v. Affiliated FM Ins. Co., No. Civ. 98434HU, 1999 WL 619100, at *7 (D. Or. Aug. 4, 1999), #11 Exhibit 11.U.S. Dept. of Health and Human Services, Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, Guidance for Cleaning and Disinfecting: Public Spaces, Workplaces, Businesses, Schools, and Homes (April 28, 2020), #12 Exhibit 12.Paradies Shops, Inc. v. Hartford Fire Ins. Co., 2004 WL 5704715, at *1-2, *6-8 (N.D. Ga. Dec. 15, 2004), #13 Exhibit 13.S. Tex. Med. Clinics, P.A. v. CNA Fin. Corp., 2008 WL 450012, at *10 (S.D. Tex. Feb. 15, 2008))(Vogt, Heidi)
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF in Support filed by Society Insurance A Mutual Company re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) . (Vogt, Heidi)
July 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Society Insurance A Mutual Company. (Vogt, Heidi)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher E Avallone on behalf of Society Insurance A Mutual Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Christopher E. Avallone (Avallone, Christopher)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet E Cain on behalf of Society Insurance A Mutual Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Janet Cain (Cain, Janet)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth J Kushner on behalf of Society Insurance A Mutual Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Beth J. Kushner (Kushner, Beth)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi L Vogt on behalf of Society Insurance A Mutual Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Heidi L. Vogt (Vogt, Heidi)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ambrosia Indy LLC. Society Insurance A Mutual Company served on 6/15/2020. (Turke, Mary)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Ambrosia Indy LLC. (Turke, Mary)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Ambrosia Indy LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Turke, Mary)
May 22, 2020 Summons Issued as to Society Insurance A Mutual Company. (asc)
May 22, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Society Insurance, A Mutual Company by Ambrosia Indy LLC d/b/a Ambrosia Restaurant. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3458237) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Strauss, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ambrosia Indy LLC v. Society Insurance A Mutual Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ambrosia Indy LLC d/b/a Ambrosia Restaurant
Represented By: Samuel J Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Society Insurance, A Mutual Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?