Martinez-Barillas v. Guadian et al
Defendant: Matthew T Albence, Chad Wolf, Robert Guadian and Dale Schmidt
Petitioner: Jilberto Martinez-Barillas
Case Number: 2:2020cv00785
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER to John W Heiderscheidt regarding ECF registration and Admission (sent via USPS) (jcl)
May 26, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
May 26, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-03040. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Wisconsin the electronic record. (aee, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/26/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 5/22/2020. Petitioner Jilberto Martinez-Barillas ("Petitioner") has filed an emergency petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, seeking release from custody due to the spread of COVID-19 in detention facilities, which he alleges puts him at serious risk due to a heart condition. Petitioner is currently being held in civil detention by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement ("ICE") at the Dodge County, Wisconsin Jail ("Dodge County Jail") while he awaits deportation. "It is well-established that if relief under 2241 is available at all, it must be sought in the district of incarceration." Chazen v. Marske, 938 F.3d 851, 860 (7th Cir. 2019); see also Worman v. Entzel, 953 F.3d 1004, 1007 (7th Cir. 2020); Ruvira-Garcia v. Guadian, 2020 WL 1983875, at *1 (N.D. Ill. Apr. 17, 2020). Petitioner is currently incarcerated in Dodge County, Wisconsin, which is located in the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to transfer this case forthwith to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. The Clerk shall close this case number on the Court's docket. Mailed notice(cdh, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/26/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Matthew T Albence, Robert Guadian, Chad Wolf, dale schmidt (Treacy, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/26/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Matthew T Albence, Robert Guadian, Chad Wolf, dale schmidt (Oswald, Craig) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/26/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Jilberto Martinez-Barillas by John W Heiderscheidt (Heiderscheidt, John) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/26/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Petitioner Jilberto Martinez-Barillas to expedite for emergency motion for TRO (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Supplement)(Godoy, Mario) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/26/2020.]
May 21, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/26/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Jilberto Martinez-Barillas by Mario A Godoy (Godoy, Mario) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/26/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Godoy, Mario) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/26/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Jilberto Martinez-Barillas against All Defendants Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0752-17035287. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Counsel's Verification, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of M.D. Brie Williams, #3 Supplement Brief in Support)(Godoy, Mario) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/26/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/21/2020: Mailed notice (ec, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/26/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez-Barillas v. Guadian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jilberto Martinez-Barillas
Represented By: John W Heiderscheidt
Represented By: Mario A Godoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew T Albence
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig A Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig A Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Guadian
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig A Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Schmidt
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: Craig A Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?