Weeks v. Credit One Bank et al
Plaintiff: Farris Weeks
Defendant: Celtic Bank, AT&T CORP., Bank of Missouri, Comenity Bank, CNG Financial Corporation, NCB Management Services Inc., Diversified Consultants Inc., Capital One Financial Corporation, Credit One Bank, Rise Financial LLC, Citibank North America, NCB Management Services Inc, AT&T Corporation, CNG Financial Corp and Diversified Consultants Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00836
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: Brett Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 95 RESPONSE filed by Celtic Bank re #84 Brief (Non-Motion) on Plaintiff's Order to Show Cause (Armstrong, Bradley)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER UNSEALING DOCUMENTS signed by Judge Brett Ludwig on 4/27/21. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to unseal the declaration and exhibits #85 . (cc: all counsel)(MP)
April 26, 2021 Filing 93 AFFIDAVIT of Eric J. Van Schyndle . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decision and Order, #2 Exhibit B - Chart)(Van Schyndle, Eric)
April 26, 2021 Filing 92 RESPONSE filed by Credit One Bank to Plaintiff's Brief on Order to Show Cause (Van Schyndle, Eric)
April 26, 2021 Filing 91 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Bank of Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email, #2 Exhibit B - Email)(Hartsell, David)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Brett H. Ludwig on 4/23/2021 re #89 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff Brief on Order to Show Case filed by Defendant Celtic Bank. The motion is GRANTED. Celtic Bank is granted an extension of time to respond within 14 days after Plaintiffs supporting declaration is made public. (cc: all counsel) (MP)
April 23, 2021 Filing 89 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief on Order to Show Cause by Celtic Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief on Order to Show Cause)(Armstrong, Bradley)
April 20, 2021 Filing 88 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Celtic Bank re #86 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Terminate Representation of Plaintiffs . (Armstrong, Bradley)
April 19, 2021 Filing 87 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Bank of Missouri re #86 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Terminate Representation of Plaintiffs . (Hartsell, David)
April 15, 2021 Filing 86 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Terminate Representation of Plaintiffs by Farris Weeks. (Napierala, Thomas)
April 13, 2021 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #85 Declaration, ; Pursuant to General Local Rule 79, the Court will consider all documents to publicly filed unless a separate motion to seal or restrict is filed. You should file your motion to seal or restrict document immediately; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah)
April 12, 2021 Filing 85 DECLARATION of Paul Strouse (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 3, #4 Ex. 4, #5 Ex 5)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Strouse, Paul)
April 12, 2021 Filing 84 BRIEF on Order to Show Cause filed by Farris Weeks . (Strouse, Paul) Modified on 4/13/2021 (kah).
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Brett Ludwig on 3/29/21 DISMISSING CASE. The Motions to Dismiss, with prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Celtic Bank and The Bank of Missouri ( #65 , #67 ), are DENIED. Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Supporting Declaration and Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs Brief Opposing Defendants Motions to Dismiss ( #73 ) is GRANTED. Show Cause Response due by 4/12/2021. (cc: all counsel) (MP)
March 2, 2021 Filing 82 RESPONSE filed by Bank of Missouri re #80 Brief (Non-Motion) to Plaintiff's Brief on Article III Standing (Hartsell, David)
March 2, 2021 Filing 81 RESPONSE filed by Celtic Bank re #80 Brief (Non-Motion) to Plaintiff's Brief on Article III Standing (Armstrong, Bradley)
February 16, 2021 Filing 80 BRIEF filed by Farris Weeks Brief on Article III Standing. (Strouse, Paul)
February 12, 2021 Filing 79 Court Minutes and Order from Status Conference held 2/12/21 before Judge Brett Ludwig. Counsel for Plaintiff to file a brief explaining Plaintiffs Article III by standing 2/16/21. Defendants may file optional response briefs by 3/2/21. The Court took motions #65 , #67 under advisement. (Tape #10:02 - 10:35.) (MP)
February 12, 2021 Filing 78 Audio of hearing held on 02/12/2021 10:02; Audio File Size(31.4 MB) (MP)
February 9, 2021 Filing 77 STIPULATION to Dismiss AT&T by Farris Weeks. (Strouse, Paul)
February 1, 2021 Filing 76 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Bank of Missouri re #73 First MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits in Support of Response Briefs to Motions to Dismiss . (Hartsell, David)
January 29, 2021 Filing 75 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Celtic Bank re #73 First MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits in Support of Response Briefs to Motions to Dismiss in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave. (Armstrong, Bradley)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER setting Status Conference set for 2/12/2021 at 10:00 AM by Telephone signed by Judge Brett Ludwig on 1/20/21. To appear by telephone, you must call the Court conference line at 1-866-434-5269, and enter access code 1737450 before the scheduled hearing time. (cc: all counsel) (MP)
January 11, 2021 Filing 73 First MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits in Support of Response Briefs to Motions to Dismiss by Farris Weeks. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Paul Strouse, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3)(Strouse, Paul)
January 4, 2021 Filing 72 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Bank of Missouri re #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AS TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT . (Hartsell, David)
December 30, 2020 Filing 71 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Celtic Bank re #65 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint . (Armstrong, Bradley)
December 21, 2020 Filing 70 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Farris Weeks re #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AS TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT . (Strouse, Paul)
December 16, 2020 Filing 69 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Farris Weeks re #65 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint . (Strouse, Paul)
November 30, 2020 Filing 68 BRIEF in Support filed by Bank of Missouri re #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AS TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT . (Hartsell, David)
November 30, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AS TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Bank of Missouri. (Hartsell, David)
November 25, 2020 Filing 66 BRIEF in Support filed by Celtic Bank re #65 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint . (Armstrong, Bradley)
November 25, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Celtic Bank. (Armstrong, Bradley)
November 16, 2020 Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION Removal of Gordon Rees from CM/ECF Electronic Service List as a result of Dismissal by NCB Management Services Inc. (Schwartz, Andrew)
November 13, 2020 Filing 63 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT vs. All Remaining Defendants against All Defendants filed by Farris Weeks.(Strouse, Paul) Modified on 11/13/2020 (kah).
November 12, 2020 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #62 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action filed by Citibank North America ; This document was filed in the wrong case and should be REFILED in the correct case (20-cv-1515). Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah)
November 11, 2020 Filing 62 DISREGARD; FILED IN WRONG CASE MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action by Citibank North America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Supporting Motion to Compel, #2 Declaration of Judy DeLage, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration)(Vehrs, Karla) Modified on 11/12/2020 (kah).
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER on #57 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Rise Financial LLC, #20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Lawsuit, or in the Alternative, to Stay the Proceedings MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay filed by Rise Financial LLC signed by Judge Brett Ludwig on 11/2/20. Rise Financial, LLC, d/b/a RISE is dismissed from this action without prejudice and without costs, to allow the parties to arbitrate. (cc: all counsel) (MP)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER on #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendantm CNGFinancial Corporation, and Compel Arbitration filed by CNG Financial Corp, #49 Stipulation filed by CNG Financial Corp. signed by Judge Brett Ludwig on 11/2/20. CNG Financial Corporation is dismissed from this action without prejudice and without costs, to allow the parties to arbitrate. (cc: all counsel) (MP)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER on re #55 Stipulation filed by Citibank North America, #51 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Citibank North America signed by Judge Brett Ludwig on 11/2/20. Citibank, N.A. is dismissed from this action without prejudice and without costs, to allow the parties to arbitrate. (cc: all counsel) (MP)
November 2, 2020 Filing 58 Court Minutes and Order from Status Conference held 10/30/20 before Judge Brett Ludwig. The Court granted #31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granted #39 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granted #45 Joinder Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 11/13/2020. Diversified Consultants Inc, Capital One Financial Corporation and Comenity Bank terminated. (Tape #10:34 - 10:46.) (MP)
October 30, 2020 Filing 57 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Rise Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulation of Dismissal of RISE Without Prejudice)(Kruse, Natalia)
October 30, 2020 Filing 56 Audio of hearing held on 10/30/20 10:34; Audio File Size(11.5 MB) (MP)
October 29, 2020 Filing 55 STIPULATION to Binding Arbitration and Stay of Proceedings by Citibank North America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vehrs, Karla)
October 28, 2020 Filing 54 LETTER from Citibank, N.A. counsel Karla Vehrs to Judge Ladwig re Status Conference. (Vehrs, Karla)
October 16, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Hearing: This case was reassigned to Judge Brett H. Ludwig on 9/21/20. A status conference will be held via conference call on 10/30/2020 at 10:30 AM. To appear by telephone, you must call the Court conference line at 1-866-434-5269, and enter access code 1737450 before the scheduled hearing time. Participants will be placed on hold until the case is called. Counsel should be ready to provide the court with a short (10 minutes per side) summary of the case, including their plans for moving the case forward. (cc: all counsel) (MP)
September 30, 2020 Filing 52 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Bank of Missouri re #39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Hartsell, David)
September 29, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Citibank North America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Vehrs, Karla)
September 29, 2020 Filing 50 PROPOSED proposed Order re Stipulation to Stay Proceedings & Compel Arbitration, as to Plaintiff and Defendant, CNG Financial Corporation filed by CNG Financial Corp. (Cornetta, Matt)
September 29, 2020 Filing 49 STIPULATION Stipulation to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration, as to Plaintiff and Defendant, CNG FInancial Corporation by CNG Financial Corp. (Cornetta, Matt)
September 21, 2020 This case has been reassigned to newly appointed Judge Brett Ludwig. (kmm)
September 17, 2020 Filing 48 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Farris Weeks re #39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Strouse, Paul)
September 10, 2020 Filing 47 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Credit One Bank re #31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Van Schyndle, Eric)
September 4, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by James K Schultz on behalf of AT&T Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: James K. Schultz (Schultz, James)
September 4, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE by AT&T Corporation of Joinder in Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (B)(6) (ECF nos. #31 and #39 ) (Cunningham, Andrew) Modified on 9/4/2020 (amb).
September 1, 2020 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #42 , #43 , #44 Request for Subpoenas; Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45, attorneys may issue subpoenas and pursuant Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d) certain discovery documents should not be filed. Refer to the federal rules for further information. (jcl)
September 1, 2020 Filing 44 REQUEST by All Plaintiffs for Subpoena. (Strouse, Paul)
September 1, 2020 Filing 43 REQUEST by All Plaintiffs for Subpoena. (Strouse, Paul)
September 1, 2020 Filing 42 REQUEST by All Plaintiffs for Subpoena. (Strouse, Paul)
August 31, 2020 Filing 41 DISCLOSURE Statement by Bank of Missouri. (Hartsell, David)
August 31, 2020 Filing 40 BRIEF in Support filed by Bank of Missouri re #39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Novero v. Duke Energy (Unreported Case))(Hartsell, David)
August 31, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bank of Missouri. (Hartsell, David)
August 28, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan E Groh on behalf of Bank of Missouri. Attorney(s) appearing: Susan E. Groh (Groh, Susan)
August 26, 2020 Filing 37 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Farris Weeks re #31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Strouse, Paul)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Granting #36 Stipulation for Extension of Time signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/20/20. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
August 18, 2020 Filing 36 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Amended Complaint by Bank of Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by David L Hartsell on behalf of Bank of Missouri. Attorney(s) appearing: David L. Hartsell (Hartsell, David)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Granting #30 Stipulation for Extension of Time for AT&T to File Responsive Pleading signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/13/20. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
August 10, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Marci V Kawski on behalf of Rise Financial LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Marci V. Kawski (Kawski, Marci)
August 10, 2020 Filing 33 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint, by Celtic Bank.(Armstrong, Bradley)
August 7, 2020 Filing 32 BRIEF in Support filed by Credit One Bank re #31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Van Schyndle, Eric)
August 7, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Credit One Bank. (Van Schyndle, Eric)
August 7, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION for extension of time to file responsive pleading by AT&T Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Andrew)
August 7, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew E Cunningham on behalf of AT&T Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew E. Cunningham (Cunningham, Andrew)
August 7, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan I Marcus on behalf of AT&T Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Morgan I. Marcus (Marcus, Morgan)
July 29, 2020 Filing 27 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Credit One Bank. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Van Schyndle, Eric)
July 21, 2020 Filing 26 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by NCB Management Services Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Schwartz, Andrew)
July 21, 2020 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE Statement by NCB Management Services Inc. (Schwartz, Andrew)
July 21, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by NCB Management Services Inc.(Schwartz, Andrew)
July 21, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M Schwartz on behalf of NCB Management Services Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew M. Schwartz (Schwartz, Andrew)
July 21, 2020 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Alex Tonrey in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Lawsuit, or in the Alternative, to Stay the Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consumer Installment Loan Agreement and Federal Truth-in-Lending Disclosures)(Kruse, Natalia)
July 21, 2020 Filing 21 BRIEF in Support filed by Rise Financial LLC re #20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Lawsuit, or in the Alternative, to Stay the Proceedings . (Kruse, Natalia)
July 21, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Lawsuit, or in the Alternative, to Stay the Proceedings by Rise Financial LLC. (Kruse, Natalia).
July 21, 2020 Filing 19 Rise's ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint, by Rise Financial LLC.(Kruse, Natalia)
July 21, 2020 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE Statement by Citibank North America. (Vehrs, Karla) Modified on 7/21/2020 (bx).
July 21, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint, by Citibank North America.(Vehrs, Karla)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendantm CNGFinancial Corporation, and Compel Arbitration by CNG Financial Corp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Victoria Reyna (Ex. A attached))(Cornetta, Matt)
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Matt J Cornetta on behalf of CNG Financial Corp. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew J. Cornetta (Cornetta, Matt)
July 17, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (amb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Celtic Bank. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Armstrong, Bradley)
July 17, 2020 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT CELTIC BANK requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah)
July 16, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Credit One Bank answer due 8/7/2020. (jh)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 7/16/20. Defendant Credit One Bank's unopposed motion for extension of time, ECF No. #11 , is GRANTED. Credit One may have until 8/7/20 to respond to the plaintiff's amended complaint. (cc: all counsel) (jh)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 7/16/20. Defendant Celtic Bank's unopposed motion for extension of time, ECF No. #9 , is GRANTED. Celtic Bank may have until 8/10/20 to respond to the plaintiff's amended complaint. (cc: all counsel) (jh)
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time For Responsive Pleading by Credit One Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Extension)(Van Schyndle, Eric)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by Celtic Bank. (Armstrong, Bradley)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Celtic Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Bradley)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R Armstrong on behalf of Celtic Bank. Attorney(s) appearing: Bradley R. Armstrong (Armstrong, Bradley)
July 6, 2020 NOTICE from the clerk to CREDIT ONE BANK requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J Van Schyndle on behalf of Credit One Bank. Attorney(s) appearing: Eric J. Van Schyndle (Van Schyndle, Eric)
June 19, 2020 Summons Issued as to AT&T Corporation, Bank of Missouri, CNG Financial Corp, Capital One Financial Corporation, Celtic Bank, Citibank North America, Comenity Bank, Credit One Bank, Diversified Consultants Inc, NCB Management Services Inc, Rise Financial LLC. (kah)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Farris Weeks. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Strouse, Paul)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Farris Weeks (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Strouse, Paul)
June 16, 2020 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #3 Request for Issuance of Summons filed by Farris Weeks ; The attached summonses were not prepared using the version found on our website or were not saved properly - please follow the instructions and RESUBMIT the summonses using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the # summons instructions for further guidance. Also, the #4 Disclosure Statement entry contained other documents. In the future, please attach only the pertinent documents to a specific docket entry.(kah)
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Farris Weeks. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Disclosure Statement)(Strouse, Paul)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Farris Weeks (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Strouse, Paul)
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AT&T Corporation, Bank of Missouri, CNG Financial Corp, Capital One Financial Corporation, Celtic Bank, Citibank North America, Comenity Bank, Credit One Bank, Diversified Consultants Inc, NCB Management Services Inc, Rise Financial LLC filed by Farris Weeks.(Strouse, Paul)
June 4, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (kah)
June 4, 2020 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The cause of action and nature of suit chosen have been modified. The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (kah)
June 4, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T CORP., Bank of Missouri, CNG Financial Corporation, Capital One Financial Corporation, Celtic Bank, Citibank North America, Comenity Bank, Credit One Bank, Diversified Consultants Inc., NCB Management Services Inc., Rise Financial LLC by Farris Weeks. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3469039) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(Strouse, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weeks v. Credit One Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celtic Bank
Represented By: Bradley R Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Missouri
Represented By: David L Hartsell
Represented By: Susan E Groh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNG Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCB Management Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Consultants Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank
Represented By: Eric J Van Schyndle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rise Financial LLC
Represented By: Natalia S Kruse
Represented By: Marci V Kawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank North America
Represented By: Karla Vehrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCB Management Services Inc
Represented By: Andrew M Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corporation
Represented By: James K Schultz
Represented By: Morgan I Marcus
Represented By: Andrew E Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNG Financial Corp
Represented By: Matt J Cornetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Consultants Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farris Weeks
Represented By: Paul A Strouse
Represented By: Thomas R Napierala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?