District Council No 7 et al v. Pepper Construction Co
Plaintiff: Local Union No 781 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades AFL-CIO and District Council No 7
Defendant: Pepper Construction Co
Case Number: 2:2020cv00912
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 7/20/2020. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 8/19/2020. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE Statement by Pepper Construction Co. (Dill, Jesse)
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Statement of Defenses to Paintiffs Complaint and Petition to Compel Arbitration by Pepper Construction Co.(Dill, Jesse)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse R Dill on behalf of Pepper Construction Co. Attorney(s) appearing: Richard L. Samson (Dill, Jesse)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse R Dill on behalf of Pepper Construction Co. Attorney(s) appearing: Jesse R. Dill (Dill, Jesse)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Pepper Construction Co., Jeff Johnson, served with Summons, Complaint and Petition to Compel Arbitration, Disclosure Statement, and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge on 06/24/2020 (Robbins, Matthew) Modified on 6/30/2020 (vkb)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed; Pepper Construction Co. c/o CT Corporation System served with Summons, Complaint and Petition to Compel Arbitration, Disclosure Statement, and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge on 06/25/2020 (Robbins, Matthew) Modified on 6/30/2020 (vkb)
June 22, 2020 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (kah)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Robbins, Matthew)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 ATTACHMENTS Exhibit C - Grievance by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Robbins, Matthew)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 ATTACHMENTS Exhibit B - Article 3, Sec. 7 by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Robbins, Matthew)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 ATTACHMENTS Exhibit A - Milwaukee Area Agreement by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Robbins, Matthew)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Robbins, Matthew)
June 17, 2020 Summons Issued as to Pepper Construction Co (kah)
June 17, 2020 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (kah)
June 17, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (bx)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Petition to Compel Arbitration against Pepper Construction Co. by Local Union No. 781, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3481573) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robbins, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: District Council No 7 et al v. Pepper Construction Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union No 781 International Union of Painters and Allied Trades AFL-CIO
Represented By: Matthew R Robbins
Represented By: Sara J Geenen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council No 7
Represented By: Matthew R Robbins
Represented By: Sara J Geenen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pepper Construction Co
Represented By: Richard L Samson
Represented By: Jesse R Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?